There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that the United States Postal Service should take all appropriate measures to ensure the continuation of its 6-day mail delivery service.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/11/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
02/11/2021Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
02/11/2021Introduced in House

Cosponsors (124)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/11/2021
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/18/2021
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 02/18/2021
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 02/18/2021
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/23/2021
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 02/23/2021
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 02/23/2021
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 02/23/2021
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 02/23/2021
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/23/2021
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 02/23/2021
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 02/23/2021
Resident Commissioner Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 02/23/2021
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 02/23/2021
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [R-NJ-2] 02/23/2021
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 02/23/2021
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/25/2021
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 02/25/2021
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 02/25/2021
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 02/25/2021
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/25/2021
Rep. Garbarino, Andrew R. [R-NY-2] 02/25/2021
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 02/25/2021
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 02/25/2021
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 02/25/2021
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 02/25/2021
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 02/25/2021
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 02/25/2021
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/26/2021
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 02/26/2021
Rep. Tiffany, Thomas P. [R-WI-7] 02/26/2021
Rep. Hinson, Ashley [R-IA-1] 02/26/2021
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/26/2021
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 02/26/2021
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/26/2021
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 03/01/2021
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 03/01/2021
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 03/01/2021
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/01/2021
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 03/01/2021
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/02/2021
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/02/2021
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/02/2021
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 03/08/2021
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 03/08/2021
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 03/08/2021
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 03/08/2021
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 03/08/2021
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/08/2021
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 03/08/2021
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/08/2021
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 03/08/2021
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 03/08/2021
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 03/08/2021
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/11/2021
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 03/11/2021
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 03/11/2021
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/11/2021
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 03/11/2021
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/11/2021
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 03/11/2021
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 03/11/2021
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/16/2021
Rep. Kim, Young [R-CA-39] 03/16/2021
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 03/16/2021
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 03/16/2021
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 03/16/2021
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/16/2021
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 03/16/2021
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 03/19/2021
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 03/19/2021
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/23/2021
Rep. Gimenez, Carlos A. [R-FL-26] 03/23/2021
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/23/2021
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/26/2021
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 03/26/2021
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10] 04/01/2021
Rep. Williams, Nikema [D-GA-5] 04/01/2021
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/01/2021
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 04/05/2021
Rep. Ross, Deborah K. [D-NC-2] 04/08/2021
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 04/08/2021
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/08/2021
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 04/08/2021
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/08/2021
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 04/08/2021
Rep. Manning, Kathy E. [D-NC-6] 04/08/2021
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 04/13/2021
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 04/13/2021
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 04/15/2021
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 04/16/2021
Rep. Salazar, Maria Elvira [R-FL-27] 04/16/2021
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/19/2021
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 04/21/2021
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/21/2021
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 04/21/2021
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/21/2021
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 04/21/2021
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 04/21/2021
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/26/2021
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/26/2021
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 04/28/2021
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 05/04/2021
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 05/07/2021
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/07/2021
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 05/07/2021
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-17] 05/17/2021
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/19/2021
Rep. Cammack, Kat [R-FL-3] 05/19/2021
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/20/2021
Rep. Strickland, Marilyn [D-WA-10] 05/25/2021
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 05/25/2021
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 05/25/2021
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 05/28/2021
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 05/28/2021
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/04/2021
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/11/2021
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/11/2021
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/11/2021
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/14/2021
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11] 06/14/2021
Rep. Bentz, Cliff [R-OR-2] 06/21/2021
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/21/2021
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/21/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Reform02/11/2021 Referred to

As of 06/24/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.114 - Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that the United States Postal Service should take all appropriate measures to ensure the continuation of its 6-day mail delivery service.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.114. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/11/2021)

This resolution urges the U.S. Postal Service to take steps to ensure the continuation of its six-day mail delivery service.