There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Requesting the President transmit to the House of Representatives not later than 14 days after the date of the adoption of this resolution documents in his possession relating to the amount of funding previously enacted and currently unspent in certain public laws.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/15/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
02/15/2021Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
02/15/2021Introduced in House

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1]* 02/15/2021
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 02/15/2021
Rep. Boebert, Lauren [R-CO-3]* 02/15/2021
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/15/2021
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 02/15/2021
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27]* 02/15/2021
Rep. Clyde, Andrew S. [R-GA-9]* 02/15/2021
Rep. Fallon, Pat [R-TX-4]* 02/15/2021
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/15/2021
Rep. Franklin, C. Scott [R-FL-15]* 02/15/2021
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 02/15/2021
Rep. Good, Bob [R-VA-5]* 02/15/2021
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 02/15/2021
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 02/15/2021
Rep. Herrell, Yvette [R-NM-2]* 02/15/2021
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 02/15/2021
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3]* 02/15/2021
Rep. Hinson, Ashley [R-IA-1]* 02/15/2021
Rep. Keller, Fred [R-PA-12]* 02/15/2021
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1]* 02/15/2021
Rep. LaTurner, Jake [R-KS-2]* 02/15/2021
Rep. Mace, Nancy [R-SC-1]* 02/15/2021
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5]* 02/15/2021
Rep. Obernolte, Jay [R-CA-8]* 02/15/2021
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-17]* 02/15/2021
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11]* 02/15/2021
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 02/18/2021
Rep. Donalds, Byron [R-FL-19] 02/18/2021
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 02/18/2021
Rep. Jacobs, Chris [R-NY-27] 02/18/2021
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/18/2021
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 02/23/2021
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-50] 02/23/2021
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/23/2021
Rep. Johnson, Dusty [R-SD-At Large] 02/23/2021
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 02/23/2021
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/23/2021
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10] 02/23/2021
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/23/2021
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 02/23/2021
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 02/23/2021
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 02/23/2021
Rep. Meuser, Daniel [R-PA-9] 02/23/2021
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 02/23/2021
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/23/2021
Rep. Bishop, Dan [R-NC-9] 02/23/2021
Rep. Moore, Barry [R-AL-2] 02/23/2021
Rep. Mann, Tracey [R-KS-1] 02/24/2021
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/24/2021
Rep. Cline, Ben [R-VA-6] 02/24/2021
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/24/2021
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 02/24/2021
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/24/2021
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 02/25/2021
Rep. Bentz, Cliff [R-OR-2] 03/17/2021
Rep. Van Duyne, Beth [R-TX-24] 03/17/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Reform02/15/2021 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.127. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/15/2021)

This resolution requests that the President transmit to the House of Representatives documents related to the amount of funding that was provided in specified laws regarding COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) and is currently unspent.

The specified laws include

  • the Coronavirus Preparedness and Response Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2020;
  • the Families First Coronavirus Response Act;
  • the Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act (CARES Act);
  • the Paycheck Protection Program and Health Care Enhancement Act; and
  • Division N of the Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2021.