There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Condemning the continued violation of rights and freedoms of the people of Hong Kong by the People's Republic of China and the Government of the Hong Kong Special Administrative Region.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
04/19/2021Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 418 - 1 (Roll no. 121).(text: CR H1927)
02/18/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date All Actions
04/19/2021-7:39pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/19/2021-7:39pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 418 - 1 (Roll no. 121). (text: CR H1927)
04/19/2021-7:09pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1943-1944)
04/19/2021-5:47pmAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
04/19/2021-5:23pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 130.
04/19/2021-5:23pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1927-1930)
04/19/2021-5:22pmMr. Meeks moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
02/25/2021Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
02/25/2021Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
02/18/2021Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
02/18/2021Introduced in House

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/18/2021
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 02/18/2021
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/18/2021
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7]* 02/18/2021
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 02/18/2021
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 02/22/2021
Rep. Jacobs, Sara [D-CA-53] 02/22/2021
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 02/22/2021
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 02/22/2021
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 02/23/2021
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 02/23/2021
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 02/23/2021
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 02/23/2021
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-50] 02/23/2021
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 02/23/2021
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 02/23/2021
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/23/2021
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/23/2021
Rep. Kim, Young [R-CA-39] 02/23/2021
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 02/23/2021
Rep. Malliotakis, Nicole [R-NY-11] 02/23/2021
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 02/24/2021
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 02/24/2021
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/24/2021
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 02/24/2021
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 02/24/2021
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/24/2021
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/24/2021
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/24/2021
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 02/24/2021
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 02/24/2021
Rep. Timmons, William R. IV [R-SC-4] 02/24/2021
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 02/24/2021
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/24/2021
Rep. Meuser, Daniel [R-PA-9] 02/26/2021
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 03/03/2021
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 03/03/2021
Rep. Meijer, Peter [R-MI-3] 03/03/2021
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 03/16/2021
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/29/2021
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8] 04/19/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs02/18/2021 Referred to
02/25/2021 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.130. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (04/19/2021)

This resolution condemns the actions taken by the governments of China and Hong Kong to put in place national security legislation that violates the freedoms and rights guaranteed to the people of Hong Kong. (Hong Kong is a part of China but, by agreement, has operated a legal and economic system largely separate from China's.)