There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Impeaching Donald John Trump, President of the United States, for high crimes and misdemeanors.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/11/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
03/04/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
01/13/2021Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H159-160, H184-185)
01/11/2021Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
01/11/2021Introduced in House

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 01/11/2021
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Bush, Cori [D-MO-1]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 01/11/2021
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Williams, Nikema [D-GA-5]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Torres, Ritchie [D-NY-15]* 01/11/2021
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Bowman, Jamaal [D-NY-16]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 01/12/2021
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 01/12/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary01/11/2021 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties03/04/2021 Referred to

As of 04/12/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.26 - Impeaching Donald John Trump, President of the United States, for high crimes and misdemeanors.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.26. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/11/2021)

This resolution impeaches President Donald John Trump for high crimes and misdemeanors.

Specifically, the resolution sets forth two articles of impeachment stating that President Trump has abused the powers of the presidency.

The first article states that, using the powers of his office, President Trump sought to threaten, intimidate, and solicit the Secretary of State of Georgia to acquiesce to his demand to find enough votes to make him the winner of Georgia's presidential election, even though the votes in Georgia had already been counted three times in favor of his opponent. The article further states that, by doing so, President Trump actively undermined public faith and confidence in the integrity of American elections, subverted the rule of law, and placed his personal interests above the national interest.

The second article states that President Trump has endeavored to undermine foundations of U.S. democracy, indicating an intention to make himself an authoritarian ruler who is unaccountable to the U.S. people. The article specifies the following actions by President Trump:

  • refusing to acknowledge, and opposing efforts to protect against, Russian interference in U.S. affairs;
  • expressing willingness to accept foreign assistance to win reelection;
  • refusing to accept the results of the election;
  • undermining the ability of American citizens to exercise their rights as voters;
  • falsely alleging widespread voting fraud while producing no evidence;
  • inciting his supporters to believe falsely that the election had been stolen from him; and
  • failing to take action to protect federal officers, personnel, property, and institutions on January 6, 2021, when the Capitol was besieged by his supporters.

Both articles state that, by such conduct, President Trump warrants impeachment and trial, removal from office, and disqualification to hold U.S. office.