There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Condemning and censuring Representative Mo Brooks of Alabama.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/11/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
01/11/2021Referred to the House Committee on Ethics.
01/11/2021Introduced in House

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 01/11/2021
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 01/12/2021
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 01/12/2021
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 01/12/2021
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/12/2021
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/12/2021
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/12/2021
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 01/12/2021
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/12/2021
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/12/2021
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/12/2021
Rep. Williams, Nikema [D-GA-5] 01/12/2021
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 01/12/2021
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 01/12/2021
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/12/2021
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 01/12/2021
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 01/12/2021
Rep. Jacobs, Sara [D-CA-53] 01/12/2021
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 01/12/2021
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 01/12/2021
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 01/12/2021
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 01/21/2021
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/21/2021
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 01/21/2021
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 01/21/2021
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 01/21/2021
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 01/21/2021
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 01/21/2021
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 01/21/2021
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/21/2021
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 01/25/2021
Rep. Jones, Mondaire [D-NY-17] 01/25/2021
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 01/25/2021
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 01/25/2021
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 02/01/2021
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 02/01/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ethics01/11/2021 Referred to

As of 04/12/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.31 - Condemning and censuring Representative Mo Brooks of Alabama.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.31. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/11/2021)

This resolution censures Representative Mo Brooks for statements he made before and after the violence and property damage at the U.S. Capitol on January 6, 2021.