There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that clean water is a national priority and that the April 21, 2020, Navigable Waters Protection Rule should not be withdrawn or vacated.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/14/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
04/15/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
04/14/2021Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
04/14/2021Introduced in House

Cosponsors (124)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 04/14/2021
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/14/2021
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Boebert, Lauren [R-CO-3]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 04/14/2021
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Bishop, Dan [R-NC-9]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Herrell, Yvette [R-NM-2]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Mann, Tracey [R-KS-1]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Hinson, Ashley [R-IA-1]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Fischbach, Michelle [R-MN-7]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Feenstra, Randy [R-IA-4]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Rosendale Sr., Matthew M. [R-MT-At Large]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Keller, Fred [R-PA-12]* 04/14/2021
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Bentz, Cliff [R-OR-2]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-17]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/14/2021
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 04/14/2021
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Moore, Blake D. [R-UT-1]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Fulcher, Russ [R-ID-1]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Tiffany, Thomas P. [R-WI-7]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Carl, Jerry L. [R-AL-1]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Owens, Burgess [R-UT-4]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Armstrong, Kelly [R-ND-At Large]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Malliotakis, Nicole [R-NY-11]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Harshbarger, Diana [R-TN-1]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3]* 04/14/2021
Rep. Jacobs, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/15/2021
Rep. Johnson, Dusty [R-SD-At Large] 04/15/2021
Resident Commissioner Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 04/15/2021
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 04/15/2021
Rep. Cammack, Kat [R-FL-3] 04/15/2021
Rep. Hollingsworth, Trey [R-IN-9] 04/15/2021
Rep. Pfluger, August [R-TX-11] 04/15/2021
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 04/15/2021
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 04/15/2021
Rep. Bice, Stephanie I. [R-OK-5] 04/15/2021
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/15/2021
Rep. Obernolte, Jay [R-CA-8] 04/15/2021
Rep. Jackson, Ronny [R-TX-13] 04/15/2021
Rep. Steel, Michelle [R-CA-48] 04/15/2021
Rep. Rose, John W. [R-TN-6] 04/15/2021
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 04/15/2021
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1] 04/15/2021
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3] 04/16/2021
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 04/22/2021
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/28/2021
Rep. Steil, Bryan [R-WI-1] 04/28/2021
Rep. Letlow, Julia [R-LA-5] 05/04/2021
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-50] 06/16/2021
Rep. LaTurner, Jake [R-KS-2] 06/30/2021
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 07/20/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure04/14/2021 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment04/15/2021 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.318. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/14/2021)

This resolution expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that (1) clean water is a national priority, and (2) the 2020 final rule titled The Navigable Waters Protection Rule: Definition of "Waters of the United States" should not be withdrawn or vacated.