There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Honoring the bravery and self-sacrifice by officers of the United States Capitol Police and other Federal, State, and local law enforcement agencies during the January 6, 2021, attack on the United States Capitol.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/12/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
03/04/2021Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
01/12/2021Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/12/2021Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/12/2021Introduced in House

Cosponsors (136)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 01/12/2021
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 01/13/2021
Rep. Hinson, Ashley [R-IA-1] 01/13/2021
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/13/2021
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13] 01/13/2021
Rep. Bishop, Dan [R-NC-9] 01/13/2021
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 01/13/2021
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/13/2021
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 01/13/2021
Rep. Murphy, Gregory [R-NC-3] 01/13/2021
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 01/13/2021
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 01/13/2021
Rep. Boebert, Lauren [R-CO-3] 01/13/2021
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 01/13/2021
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 01/13/2021
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 01/13/2021
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 01/13/2021
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/13/2021
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 01/13/2021
Rep. Rose, John W. [R-TN-6] 01/13/2021
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 01/13/2021
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/13/2021
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 01/13/2021
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 01/13/2021
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 01/13/2021
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 01/13/2021
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 01/13/2021
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 01/13/2021
Rep. Fulcher, Russ [R-ID-1] 01/13/2021
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 01/13/2021
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 01/13/2021
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 01/13/2021
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 01/13/2021
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 01/13/2021
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 01/13/2021
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 01/13/2021
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 01/13/2021
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 01/13/2021
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 01/13/2021
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 01/13/2021
Rep. Feenstra, Randy [R-IA-4] 01/13/2021
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 01/13/2021
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 01/13/2021
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 01/13/2021
Rep. Cammack, Kat [R-FL-3] 01/13/2021
Rep. Mann, Tracey [R-KS-1] 01/13/2021
Rep. Ross, Deborah K. [D-NC-2] 01/13/2021
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 01/13/2021
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 01/13/2021
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11] 01/13/2021
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 01/15/2021
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/15/2021
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/15/2021
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 01/15/2021
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 01/15/2021
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 01/15/2021
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 01/15/2021
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 01/15/2021
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 01/15/2021
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 01/15/2021
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 01/15/2021
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 01/15/2021
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 01/15/2021
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 01/15/2021
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/15/2021
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 01/15/2021
Rep. Cawthorn, Madison [R-NC-11] 01/15/2021
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 01/15/2021
Rep. Franklin, C. Scott [R-FL-15] 01/15/2021
Resident Commissioner Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 01/15/2021
Rep. Green, Mark E. [R-TN-7] 01/15/2021
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 01/15/2021
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 01/15/2021
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-50] 01/15/2021
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 01/15/2021
Rep. Obernolte, Jay [R-CA-8] 01/15/2021
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 01/15/2021
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 01/15/2021
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 01/15/2021
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/19/2021
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8] 01/19/2021
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 01/19/2021
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 01/19/2021
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 01/19/2021
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 01/19/2021
Rep. Spartz, Victoria [R-IN-5] 01/19/2021
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 01/19/2021
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 01/19/2021
Rep. Bice, Stephanie I. [R-OK-5] 01/19/2021
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 01/19/2021
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/19/2021
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 01/19/2021
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/19/2021
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 01/19/2021
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 01/19/2021
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 01/21/2021
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 01/21/2021
Rep. Pfluger, August [R-TX-11] 01/21/2021
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 01/21/2021
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 01/21/2021
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 01/21/2021
Rep. Keller, Fred [R-PA-12] 01/21/2021
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 01/21/2021
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 01/21/2021
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 01/28/2021
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 01/28/2021
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 01/28/2021
Rep. Kahele, Kaiali'i [D-HI-2] 01/28/2021
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 01/28/2021
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/28/2021
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 01/28/2021
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 01/28/2021
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 01/28/2021
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 01/28/2021
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 01/28/2021
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 01/28/2021
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4] 01/28/2021
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 01/28/2021
Rep. Fischbach, Michelle [R-MN-7] 01/28/2021
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 01/28/2021
Rep. Moore, Barry [R-AL-2] 01/28/2021
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-17] 01/28/2021
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 01/28/2021
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 01/28/2021
Rep. Van Duyne, Beth [R-TX-24] 02/04/2021
Rep. McClain, Lisa C. [R-MI-10] 02/04/2021
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/04/2021
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 02/04/2021
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 02/04/2021
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 02/04/2021
Rep. Bourdeaux, Carolyn [D-GA-7] 02/04/2021
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 02/04/2021
Del. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large] 02/04/2021
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 03/08/2021
Rep. Williams, Nikema [D-GA-5] 04/08/2021
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/15/2021

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Committee on House Administration01/12/2021 Referred to
House Judiciary01/12/2021 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security03/04/2021 Referred to

As of 06/17/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.39 - Honoring the bravery and self-sacrifice by officers of the United States Capitol Police and other Federal, State, and local law enforcement agencies during the January 6, 2021, attack on the United States Capitol.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.39. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/12/2021)

This resolution honors Officers Brian Sicknick and Howard Liebengood of the U.S. Capitol Police, and it commends the bravery and service demonstrated by officers of the U.S. Capitol Police, the Metropolitan Police Department of the District of Columbia, and the other law enforcement agencies and protective entities that assisted in responding to the January 6, 2021, attack on the U.S. Capitol.