There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that Congress should take all appropriate measures to ensure that the United States Postal Service remains an independent establishment of the Federal Government and is not subject to privatization.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/13/2021Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
01/13/2021Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
01/13/2021Introduced in House

Cosponsors (126)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 01/13/2021
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 01/25/2021
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 01/25/2021
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 01/25/2021
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/25/2021
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 01/25/2021
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 01/25/2021
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 01/25/2021
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/25/2021
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 01/25/2021
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/25/2021
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 01/25/2021
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 01/25/2021
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 01/25/2021
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 01/25/2021
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 01/25/2021
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/25/2021
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 01/25/2021
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/25/2021
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 01/25/2021
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 01/25/2021
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 01/25/2021
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/25/2021
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/25/2021
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 01/25/2021
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 01/25/2021
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 01/25/2021
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 01/25/2021
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 01/25/2021
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/25/2021
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 01/25/2021
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 01/25/2021
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 01/25/2021
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 01/25/2021
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/25/2021
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 01/25/2021
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 01/25/2021
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 01/25/2021
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 01/25/2021
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 01/25/2021
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 01/25/2021
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 01/25/2021
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/25/2021
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 01/25/2021
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/25/2021
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/25/2021
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 01/25/2021
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/25/2021
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 01/25/2021
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 01/25/2021
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 01/25/2021
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 01/25/2021
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 01/25/2021
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 01/25/2021
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/25/2021
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/25/2021
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 01/25/2021
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/25/2021
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/25/2021
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/01/2021
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 02/01/2021
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/01/2021
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/01/2021
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/01/2021
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/01/2021
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/01/2021
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/01/2021
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 02/01/2021
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 02/01/2021
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 02/01/2021
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 02/01/2021
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/01/2021
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 02/01/2021
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/01/2021
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/01/2021
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/01/2021
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 02/01/2021
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 02/01/2021
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/01/2021
Rep. Newman, Marie [D-IL-3] 02/02/2021
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/02/2021
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/02/2021
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 02/02/2021
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/02/2021
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 02/02/2021
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/02/2021
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 02/03/2021
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 02/03/2021
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/03/2021
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 02/03/2021
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 02/03/2021
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 02/05/2021
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 02/05/2021
Rep. Jones, Mondaire [D-NY-17] 02/05/2021
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 02/11/2021
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 02/11/2021
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 02/11/2021
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/18/2021
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 02/18/2021
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 02/18/2021
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/18/2021
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 02/18/2021
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 02/18/2021
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/18/2021
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/18/2021
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/18/2021
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 02/18/2021
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 02/18/2021
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/18/2021
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 02/22/2021
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/22/2021
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/22/2021
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/22/2021
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 02/24/2021
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 02/24/2021
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 02/24/2021
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 02/25/2021
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 02/25/2021
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 02/26/2021
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 02/26/2021
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 02/26/2021
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 02/26/2021
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 03/01/2021
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 03/01/2021
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 03/02/2021
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6] 03/02/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Reform01/13/2021 Referred to

As of 03/06/2021 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.47 - Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that Congress should take all appropriate measures to ensure that the United States Postal Service remains an independent establishment of the Federal Government and is not subject to privatization.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.47. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/13/2021)

This resolution expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that Congress should ensure that the U.S. Postal Service is not privatized and remains an independent establishment of the federal government.