There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for an exception to a limitation against appointment of persons as Secretary of Defense within seven years of relief from active duty as a regular commissioned officer of the Armed Forces.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/03/2021Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
03/06/2021Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate.
Action By: Senate
03/04/2021Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S1037)
Action By: Senate
03/03/2021Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S999)
Action By: Senate
01/06/2021Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 1.
Action By: Senate
01/03/2021Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (0)

As of 04/17/2021 text has not been received for S.11 - A bill to provide for an exception to a limitation against appointment of persons as Secretary of Defense within seven years of relief from active duty as a regular commissioned officer of the Armed Forces.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.11. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/03/2021)

This bill allows the first person nominated and appointed as Secretary of Defense after 12:01 p.m. (Eastern Standard Time) on January 20, 2021, to be a person who is, on the date of appointment, at least four years after relief from active duty as a commissioned officer of a regular component of the Armed Forces. Under current law, an individual may not be appointed as Secretary of Defense within seven years after relief from such active duty.