There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Protecting Tourism in the United States Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to direct the Secretary of Commerce to conduct a study and submit to Congress a report on the effects of the COVID-19 pandemic on the travel and tourism industry in the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/28/2021Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
04/28/2021Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
01/28/2021Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 01/28/2021
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV]* 01/28/2021
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 01/28/2021
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 03/24/2021
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 03/25/2021
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 04/27/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation01/28/2021 Referred to
04/28/2021 Markup by

As of 05/11/2021 no related bill information has been received for S.115 - Protecting Tourism in the United States Act


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.