There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Growing Climate Solutions Act of 2021

Short Title(s) as Reported to Senate

Growing Climate Solutions Act of 2021

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Growing Climate Solutions Act of 2021

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the Secretary of Agriculture to develop a program to reduce barriers to entry for farmers, ranchers, and private forest landowners in certain voluntary markets, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/24/2021Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 92 - 8. Record Vote Number: 251.(text: CR S4740-4743)
06/14/2021Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Reported by Senator Stabenow without amendment. Without written report.
04/20/2021Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/24/2021-4:45pmHouseHeld at the desk.
06/24/2021-4:41pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/24/2021SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/24/2021SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 92 - 8. Record Vote Number: 251. (text: CR S4740-4743)
06/24/2021SenateS.Amdt.2119 Amendment SA 2119 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 11 - 89. Record Vote Number: 250.
06/24/2021SenateS.Amdt.2119 Amendment SA 2119 proposed by Senator Lee. (consideration: CR S4736-4739; text:CR S4701-4704) In the nature of a substitute.
06/24/2021SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4736-4740)
06/14/2021SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 74.
06/14/2021SenateCommittee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Reported by Senator Stabenow without amendment. Without written report.
04/22/2021SenateCommittee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
04/20/2021SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 04/20/2021
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Romney, Mitt [R-UT]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Warnock, Raphael G. [D-GA]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Tuberville, Tommy [R-AL]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND]* 04/20/2021
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 04/21/2021
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 04/21/2021
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 04/22/2021
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 04/22/2021
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 04/22/2021
Sen. Kelly, Mark [D-AZ] 04/29/2021
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 05/10/2021
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/10/2021
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 05/10/2021
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 05/11/2021
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 05/18/2021
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 05/24/2021
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 06/08/2021
Sen. Hickenlooper, John W. [D-CO] 06/14/2021
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 06/23/2021
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/23/2021
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/23/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry04/20/2021 Referred to
04/22/2021 Markup by
06/14/2021 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1251. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (06/14/2021)

Growing Climate Solutions Act of 2021

This bill authorizes the Department of Agriculture (USDA) to establish a voluntary Greenhouse Gas Technical Assistance Provider and Third-Party Verifier Certification Program to help reduce entry barriers into voluntary environmental credit markets for farmers, ranchers, and private forest landowners. A voluntary environmental credit market is a market through which agriculture and forestry credits may be bought or sold.

Entities eligible to participate in the program are (1) providers of technical assistance to farmers, ranchers, or private forest landowners in carrying out sustainable land use management practices that prevent, reduce, or mitigate greenhouse gas emissions, or sequester carbon; or (2) third-party verifiers that conduct the verification of the processes described in the protocols for voluntary environmental credit markets.

Among other requirements, USDA must publish (1) a list of protocols and qualifications for eligible entities; (2) information describing how entities may self-certify under the program; (3) information describing how entities may obtain the expertise to meet the protocols and qualifications; and (4) instructions and suggestions to assist farmers, ranchers, and private forest landowners in facilitating the development of agriculture or forestry credits and accessing voluntary environmental credit markets.

USDA must also establish an advisory council to make recommendations regarding the list of protocols and qualifications, best practices, and voluntary environmental credit markets.

The bill also rescinds certain funds provided in the American Rescue Plan Act of 2021 and makes the funds available for the certification program.