There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Military Justice Improvement and Increasing Prevention Act of 2021

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reform the disposition of charges and convening of courts-martial for certain offenses under the Uniform Code of Military Justice and increase the prevention of sexual assaults and other crimes in the military.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/29/2021Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
04/29/2021Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (65)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 04/29/2021
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Kelly, Mark [D-AZ]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Padilla, Alex [D-CA]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Warnock, Raphael G. [D-GA]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Tuberville, Tommy [R-AL]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Hickenlooper, John W. [D-CO]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Ossoff, Jon [D-GA]* 04/29/2021
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 05/10/2021
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/10/2021
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/10/2021
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/10/2021
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 05/10/2021
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/10/2021
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/10/2021
Sen. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM] 05/10/2021
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/10/2021
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/10/2021
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 05/10/2021
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 05/10/2021
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 05/10/2021
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 05/10/2021
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO] 05/12/2021
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 05/12/2021
Sen. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS] 05/12/2021
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 05/13/2021
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/19/2021
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 05/19/2021
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 05/25/2021
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 05/26/2021
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE] 06/07/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Armed Services04/29/2021 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.