There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

A bill to provide for the availability of amounts for customer education initiatives and non-awards expenses of the Commodity Futures Trading Commission Whistleblower Program, and for other purposes.

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Commodity Exchange Act to modify the Commodity Futures Trading Commission Customer Protection Fund, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
05/28/2021Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
05/28/2021Senate Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry discharged by Unanimous Consent.
02/24/2021Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/01/2021-3:31pmHouseHeld at the desk.
06/01/2021-3:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
05/28/2021SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/28/2021SenateS.Amdt.2111 Amendment SA 2111 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
05/28/2021SenateS.Amdt.2111 Amendment SA 2111 proposed by Senator Schumer for Senator Stabenow. (consideration: CR S3932; text: CR S3932) To amend the title.
05/28/2021SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S3932)
05/28/2021SenateS.Amdt.2110 Amendment SA 2110 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
05/28/2021SenateS.Amdt.2110 Amendment SA 2110 proposed by Senator Schumer for Senator Stabenow. (consideration: CR S3931-3932; text: CR S3932) In the nature of a substitute.
05/28/2021SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S3931-3932)
05/28/2021SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry discharged by Unanimous Consent.
02/24/2021SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 02/24/2021
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 02/24/2021
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 02/24/2021
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/13/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry02/24/2021 Referred to
05/28/2021 Discharged from

As of 06/18/2021 no related bill information has been received for S.409 - A bill to provide for the availability of amounts for customer education initiatives and non-awards expenses of the Commodity Futures Trading Commission Whistleblower Program, and for other purposes.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.409. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/24/2021)

This bill expands the permissible uses of the Commodity Futures Trading Commission Customer Protection Fund to include administrative expenses.