There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Uyghur Forced Labor Prevention Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to ensure that goods made with forced labor in the Xinjiang Uyghur Autonomous Region of the People's Republic of China do not enter the United States market, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/27/2021Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
01/27/2021Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Romney, Mitt [R-UT]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 01/27/2021
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/03/2021
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 02/12/2021
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 03/02/2021
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/02/2021
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 03/22/2021
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 03/22/2021
Sen. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS] 03/23/2021
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 03/25/2021
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 03/25/2021
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/13/2021
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO] 04/14/2021
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 04/14/2021
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 04/14/2021
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 04/14/2021
Sen. Warnock, Raphael G. [D-GA] 04/15/2021
Sen. Hagerty, Bill [R-TN] 04/19/2021
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 04/20/2021
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 04/20/2021
Sen. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY] 04/26/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Foreign Relations01/27/2021 Referred to

As of 05/16/2021 no related bill information has been received for S.65 - Uyghur Forced Labor Prevention Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.65. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/27/2021)

Uyghur Forced Labor Prevention Act

This bill imposes importation limits on goods produced using forced labor in the Xinjiang Uyghur Autonomous Region in China and imposes sanctions related to such forced labor.

The Department of Homeland Security shall report to Congress a strategy for preventing the importation of goods produced in Xinjiang using forced labor. The strategy must contain certain information, including a list of entities working with the government in Xinjiang to move forced labor or Uyghurs, Kazakhs, Kyrgyz, or members of other persecuted groups out of Xinjiang.

The U.S. Customs and Border Protection shall generally presume that goods produced by these entities are barred from importation into the United States.

The bill also expands existing asset- and visa-blocking sanctions related to Xinjiang to cover foreign individuals and entities responsible for serious human rights abuses in connection with forced labor.

The Department of State shall report to Congress (1) an assessment of whether human rights abuses committed by China's government against persecuted groups in Xinjiang constitute genocide under U.S. law, and (2) a strategy to enhance international awareness of forced labor in Xinjiang and to address such forced labor.