There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Association Health Plans Act of 2021

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 to establish additional criteria for determining when employers may join together in a group or association of employers that will be treated as an employer under section 3(5) of such Act for purposes of sponsoring a group health plan, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/23/2021Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
03/23/2021Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE] 03/25/2021
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 04/14/2021
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 04/14/2021
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 04/20/2021
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL] 04/21/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions03/23/2021 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.896. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/23/2021)

Association Health Plans Act of 2021

This bill provides statutory authority for certain short-term, limited-duration health insurance plans and association health plans.

The bill permits short-term, limited-duration plans to provide coverage for a period of less than 12 months, not including extensions. Under current law, such plans are exempt from certain market requirements of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, such as coverage of individuals with preexisting conditions.

The bill further permits groups or associations of employers to sponsor fully insured group health plans as if they were employers. Such plans may not discriminate based on the health factors of any prospective plan participant for the purpose of granting an employer's membership in the association or determining a participant's eligibility for benefits or premium amounts.