Text: S.Con.Res.2 — 117th Congress (2021-2022)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Enrolled Bill

S. CON. RES. 2 Agreed to January 3, 2021


AT THE FIRST SESSION

Begun and held at the City of Washington on Sunday,
the third day of January, two thousand and twenty one

    Resolved by the Senate (the House of Representatives concurring),

    SECTION 1. Reauthorization of Joint Committee.

    Effective from January 3, 2021, the joint committee created by Senate Concurrent Resolution 38 (116th Congress), agreed to June 26, 2020, to make the necessary arrangements for the inauguration of the President-elect and the Vice President-elect of the United States, is continued with the same power and authority provided for in that resolution.

    SEC. 2. Use of Capitol.

    The rotunda and Emancipation Hall of the United States Capitol are authorized to be used on January 10, 2021, January 17, 2021, and January 20, 2021 by the joint committee created by Senate Concurrent Resolution 38 (116th Congress), agreed to June 26, 2020, in connection with the proceedings and ceremonies conducted for the inauguration of the President-elect and the Vice President-elect of the United States.

    Attest:









    Secretary of the Senate  

    Attest:









    Clerk of the House of Representatives  

    Share This