There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution disapproving the action of the District of Columbia Council in approving the Minor Consent for Vaccinations Amendment Act of 2020.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/08/2021Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
02/08/2021Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 02/08/2021
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND]* 02/08/2021
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN]* 02/08/2021
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 02/08/2021
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK]* 02/08/2021
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN] 03/01/2021
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/05/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs02/08/2021 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.7. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/08/2021)

This joint resolution nullifies the action of the District of Columbia Council in approving the Minor Consent for Vaccinations Amendment Act of 2020, enacted by the council on December 23, 2020, and transmitted on February 4, 2021 [sic], to Congress pursuant to the District of Columbia Home Rule Act. The act authorizes a minor, 11 years of age or older, to consent to receive a vaccine if the minor is capable of meeting the informed consent standard and the vaccine is recommended by the United States Advisory Committee on Immunization Practices and will be provided in accordance with its recommended immunization schedule.