There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution recognizing the Ninth Summit of the Americas and reaffirming the commitment of the United States to a more prosperous, secure, and democratic Western Hemisphere.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
05/12/2021Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2494; text: 3/17/2021 CR S1617-1618)
03/24/2021Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
03/17/2021Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
05/12/2021Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2494; text: 3/17/2021 CR S1617-1618)
03/24/2021Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 28.
03/24/2021Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
03/24/2021Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
03/17/2021Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 03/17/2021
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 03/17/2021
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 03/17/2021
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA]* 03/17/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Foreign Relations03/17/2021 Referred to
03/24/2021 Markup by
03/24/2021 Reported by

As of 07/26/2021 no related bill information has been received for S.Res.120 - A resolution recognizing the Ninth Summit of the Americas and reaffirming the commitment of the United States to a more prosperous, secure, and democratic Western Hemisphere.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Res.120. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (05/12/2021)

This resolution reaffirms the U.S. commitment to promoting economic prosperity, security, and democratic governance throughout the Americas, and it calls on the President to lead a coordinated diplomatic effort to achieve specified goals while hosting the Ninth Summit of the Americas.