There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution condemning the military coup that took place on February 1, 2021, in Burma and the Burmese military's detention of civilian leaders, calling for an immediate and unconditional release of all those detained and for those elected to serve in parliament to resume their duties without impediment, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
03/24/2021Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
02/04/2021Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
03/24/2021Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 26.
03/24/2021Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
03/24/2021Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
02/04/2021Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S487-488)

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN]* 02/04/2021
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 02/08/2021
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/04/2021
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/11/2021
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 04/20/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Foreign Relations02/04/2021 Referred to
03/24/2021 Markup by
03/24/2021 Reported by

As of 05/06/2021 no related bill information has been received for S.Res.35 - A resolution condemning the military coup that took place on February 1, 2021, in Burma and the Burmese military's detention of civilian leaders, calling for an immediate and unconditional release of all those detained and for those elected to serve in parliament to resume their duties without impediment, and for other purposes.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Res.35. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (03/24/2021)

This resolution states that the Senate supports the people of Burma (Myanmar) in their ambition for a genuine democracy, sustainable peace, genuine ethnic reconciliation, and fundamental human rights for all. It also calls on the military junta to release all those detained in the February 1, 2021, military coup, remove restrictions on travel and communications, and return the elected civilian government to power.