There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

An original resolution authorizing expenditures by committees of the Senate for the periods March 1, 2021 through September 30, 2021, October 1, 2021 through September 30, 2022, and October 1, 2022 through February 28, 2023.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
02/24/2021Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S868; text: CR 2/23/2021 S825-830)
02/23/2021Committee on Rules and Administration. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Klobuchar. Without written report.
02/23/2021Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/24/2021Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S868; text: CR 2/23/2021 S825-830)
02/23/2021Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 6.
02/23/2021Committee on Rules and Administration. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Klobuchar. Without written report.

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Rules and Administration02/23/2021 Reported original measure

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Res.70. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (02/24/2021)

This resolution authorizes certain Senate committees to make specified expenditures and employ personnel for the 117th Congress, and it establishes a special reserve to be available to the committees on an as-needed basis to meet unpaid obligations.