Titles: S.Res.70 — 117th Congress (2021-2022)All Information (Except Text)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

An original resolution authorizing expenditures by committees of the Senate for the periods March 1, 2021 through September 30, 2021, October 1, 2021 through September 30, 2022, and October 1, 2022 through February 28, 2023.