Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Special Energy Research and Development Appropriation Act

Official Titles

Official Title as Enacted

An Act making appropriations for energy research and development activities of certain departments, independent executive agencies, bureaus, offices, and commissions for the fiscal year ending June 30, 1975, and for other purposes.

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill making appropriations for energy research and development activities of certain departments, independent executive agencies, bureaus, offices, and commissions for the fiscal year ending June 30, 1975.


Actions Overview (14)

Date
06/30/1974Public law 93-322.
06/30/1974Signed by President.
06/28/1974Measure presented to President.
06/24/1974Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendment to Senate amendment.
06/24/1974Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report.
06/24/1974Resolving differences -- House actions: House receded and concurred in Senate amendment with an amendment.
06/24/1974Resolving differences -- House actions: House receded and concurred in certain Senate amendments.
06/24/1974Conference report agreed to in House: House agreed to conference report.
06/19/1974Conference report filed: Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-1123.
06/12/1974Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #253 (92-0).
06/05/1974Reported to Senate from the Committee on Appropriations with amendment, S. Rept. 93-903.
04/30/1974Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, roll call #195 (392-4).
04/25/1974Reported to House from the Committee on Appropriations, H. Rept. 93-1010.
04/25/1974Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
06/30/1974Public law 93-322.
06/30/1974Signed by President.
06/28/1974HouseMeasure presented to President.
06/24/1974SenateSenate agreed to House amendment to Senate amendment.
06/24/1974SenateSenate agreed to conference report.
06/24/1974HouseHouse receded and concurred in Senate amendment with an amendment.
06/24/1974HouseHouse receded and concurred in certain Senate amendments.
06/24/1974HouseHouse agreed to conference report.
06/19/1974HouseConference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-1123.
06/17/1974HouseConference scheduled in House.
06/12/1974SenateConference scheduled in Senate.
06/12/1974SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended, roll call #253 (92-0).
06/05/1974SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Appropriations with amendment, S. Rept. 93-903.
05/01/1974SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Appropriations.
04/30/1974HouseMeasure passed House, roll call #195 (392-4).
04/25/1974HouseReported to House from the Committee on Appropriations, H. Rept. 93-1010.
04/25/1974HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Appropriations05/01/1974 Referred to
06/05/1974 Reported by S.Rept 93-903
House Appropriations04/25/1974 Reported by H.Rept 93-1010

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.14434. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/25/1974)

Special Energy Research and Development Appropriation Act - Makes appropriations for energy research and development activities of various Federal departments, independent executive agencies, bureaus, offices, and commissions for the fiscal year ending June 30, 1975.