Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Emergency Jobs Act

Official Titles

Official Title as Enacted

An Act to provide assistance for unemployed persons.

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend the Comprehensive Employment and Training Act of 1973 to provide additional jobs for unemployed persons through programs of public service employment.


Actions Overview (10)

Date Actions Overview
12/31/1974Public law 93-567.
12/31/1974Signed by President.
12/24/1974Measure presented to President.
12/18/1974Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report.
12/18/1974Conference report agreed to in House: House agreed to conference report, roll call #706 (346-58).
12/17/1974Conference report filed: Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-1621.
12/13/1974Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended (provisions of S. 4079 inserted as passed 12/12/74).
12/12/1974Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, roll call #679 (322-53).
12/09/1974Reported to House from the Committee on Education and Labor with amendment, H. Rept. 93-1528.
09/11/1974Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/31/1974Public law 93-567.
12/31/1974Signed by President.
12/24/1974HouseMeasure presented to President.
12/18/1974SenateSenate agreed to conference report.
12/18/1974HouseHouse agreed to conference report, roll call #706 (346-58).
12/17/1974HouseConference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-1621.
12/13/1974SenateConference scheduled in Senate.
12/13/1974HouseConference scheduled in House.
12/13/1974SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended (provisions of S. 4079 inserted as passed 12/12/74).
12/12/1974HouseMeasure passed House, amended, roll call #679 (322-53).
12/09/1974HouseReported to House from the Committee on Education and Labor with amendment, H. Rept. 93-1528.
09/11/1974HouseReferred to House Committee on Education and Labor.
09/11/1974HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor09/11/1974 Referred to
12/09/1974 Reported by H.Rept 93-1528

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.16596. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 93-567 (12/31/1974)

(LATEST SUMMARY)

Emergency Jobs and Unemployment Assistance Act - =Title I: Public Service Employment= - Authorizes appropriation of $2,500,000,000 for fiscal year 1975 to carry out this Act.

Directs the Secretary of Labor to enter into arrangements with eligible appliants to provide financial assistance in providing transitional employment in public service jobs, and training and manpower services related to such employment. Requires that 90 percent of funds to applicants be used for wages and employment benefits to persons employed in public service jobs under this Act.

Requires preference to unemployed persons who have exhausted their benefits, those who are ineligible for such benefits, and those unemployed for 15 or more weeks.

Sets forth a formula for allotment of funds to areas of unemployment.

Sets forth provisions for areas of excessively high unemployment (above 7 percent) and to expand job opportunities.

Allows prime sponsors, under the Comprehensive Employment and Training Act of 1973, to use funds obligated for public service employment for projects planned to extend over a 12-month period.

Disallows a requirement that applicants place a proportion of public service jobholders in other jobs.

Authorizes the Secretary of Labor to recommend to prime sponsors an aim of maintaining a nationwide average in federally supported wage rates per public service jobholder of $7,800.

Establishes an outreach program and public information program designed to produce jobs and job training opportunities for specified veterans, and to inform them about jobs, job training, and educational opportunities under the Comprehensive Employment and Training Act of 1973. Requires that such program also inform employers, labor unions, contractors, Federal agencies, and educational institutions of their responsibilities under such Act.

=Title II: Special Unemployment Assistance Program= - Provides for the payment to each State, which enters into a specified agreement with the Secretary of Labor of such amounts as are deemed necessary by the Secretary to carry out the provisions of this title in the State.

Sets forth a schedule whereunder eligible individuals may receive a payment of assistance or waiting period credit based upon a week of unemployment.

Sets a special unemployment assistance period under this title.

Sets forth a schedule for determining the weekly benefit amount payable under this title.

Sets a limit on the program duration under this title.

Authorizes the appropriation of such sums as may be necessary to carry out this title.

=Title III: Job Opportunities Program= - Authorizes the Secretary of Commerce to provide financial assistance to Federal programs and projects identified through a specified review process.

Requires that funds allocated under this title be for programs which the Secretaries of Commerce and Labor jointly determine will contribute significantly to the reduction of unemployment; can be initiated promptly; and can be largely completed within 12 months.

Requires Federal agencies and regional commissions established under the Appalachian Regional Development Act of 1965 or pursuant to this Act to review their budgets and plans; evaluate the job creation effectiveness of such plans; and to submit to the Secretaries of Commerce and Labor recommendations for programs with potential for creating jobs.

Authorizes to be appropriated $500,000,000 for fiscal year 1975 to carry out the provisions of this title, except that no further obligation of funds appropriated under this title may be made subsequent to a determination that the average rate of unemployment has receded below 6.5 per cent for three consecutive calendar months as determined by the Secretary of Labor.