Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to continue the existing temporary increase in the public debt limit through November 30, 1973, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (14)

Date Actions Overview
07/01/1973Public law 93-53.
07/01/1973Signed by President.
06/30/1973Measure presented to President.
06/30/1973Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendments.
06/30/1973Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report, roll call #267 (63-2).
06/30/1973Resolving differences -- House actions: House receded and concurred in certain Senate amendments, roll call #321 (294-54).
06/30/1973Conference report filed: Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-362.
06/29/1973Resolving differences -- House actions: House rejected a motion to recede from its disagreement to the amendment of the Senate, roll call #319 (185-190).
06/28/1973Conference report filed: Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-355.
06/27/1973Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #251 (72-19).
06/25/1973Reported to Senate from the Committee on Finance with amendment, S. Rept. 93-249.
06/13/1973Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, roll call #219 (261-152).
06/08/1973Reported to House from the Committee on Ways and Means, H. Rept. 93-267.
06/06/1973Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/01/1973Public law 93-53.
07/01/1973Signed by President.
06/30/1973HouseMeasure presented to President.
06/30/1973SenateSenate agreed to House amendments.
06/30/1973SenateSenate agreed to conference report, roll call #267 (63-2).
06/30/1973HouseHouse receded and concurred in certain Senate amendments, roll call #321 (294-54).
06/30/1973HouseConference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-362.
06/29/1973HouseHouse rejected a motion to recede from its disagreement to the amendment of the Senate, roll call #319 (185-190).
06/29/1973HouseConference scheduled in House.
06/28/1973HouseConference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-355.
06/28/1973HouseConference scheduled in House.
06/27/1973SenateConference scheduled in Senate.
06/27/1973SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended, roll call #251 (72-19).
06/25/1973SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Finance with amendment, S. Rept. 93-249.
06/14/1973SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Finance.
06/13/1973HouseMeasure passed House, roll call #219 (261-152).
06/08/1973HouseReported to House from the Committee on Ways and Means, H. Rept. 93-267.
06/06/1973HouseReferred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
06/06/1973HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Rep. Schneebeli, Herman T. [R-PA-17]

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means06/06/1973 Referred to
06/08/1973 Reported by H.Rept 93-267
Senate Finance06/14/1973 Referred to
06/25/1973 Reported by S.Rept 93-249

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.8410. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 93-53 (07/01/1973)

(LATEST SUMMARY)

Extends the temporary increase in the public debt limit from June 30, 1973, to November 30, 1973.

Authorizes additional supplemental allotments to States under Title V, "Maternal Services," of the Social Security Act and authorizes appropriations for such allotments.

Provides under the Internal Revenue Code of 1954 that any individual whose income tax liability for the taxable year is $1 or more may designate that $1 shall be paid over to the Presidential Election Campaign Fund.

Establishes on the books of the Treasury Department a special fund to be known as the "Presidential Election Campaign Fund". Provides that the Secretary shall pay to eligible candidates an amount certified by the Comptroller General.