Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to provide for increasing the amount of interest paid on the permanent fund of the U.S. Soldiers' and Airmen's Home.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
12/15/1973Public law 93-185.
12/15/1973Signed by President.
12/05/1973Measure presented to President.
11/30/1973Resolving differences -- House actions: House agreed to Senate amendments.
11/16/1973Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
11/15/1973Reported to Senate from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, S. Rept. 93-516.
07/16/1973Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House.
06/20/1973Reported to House from the Committee on Armed Services, H. Rept. 93-300.
06/07/1973Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/15/1973Public law 93-185.
12/15/1973Signed by President.
12/05/1973HouseMeasure presented to President.
11/30/1973HouseHouse agreed to Senate amendments.
11/16/1973SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
11/15/1973SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, S. Rept. 93-516.
07/17/1973SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Armed Services.
07/16/1973HouseMeasure passed House.
06/20/1973HouseReported to House from the Committee on Armed Services, H. Rept. 93-300.
06/07/1973HouseReferred to House Committee on Armed Services.
06/07/1973HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Rep. Hunt, John E. [R-NJ-1]

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services06/07/1973 Referred to
06/20/1973 Reported by H.Rept 93-300
Senate Armed Services07/17/1973 Referred to
11/15/1973 Reported by S.Rept 93-516

No related bill information was received for H.R.8528.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.8528. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 93-185 (12/15/1973)

(LATEST SUMMARY)

Increases the amount of interest paid on the permanent fund of the United States Soldiers' and Airmen's Home from 3 percent to a rate determined by the Secretary of the Treasury, taking into consideration the current average market yield on outstanding marketable obligations of the United States with remaining periods to maturity comparable to the average maturities of such investments, adjusted to the nearest one-eight of 1 percent. Amends 24 U.S.C. 46