Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Department of Housing and Urban Development; Space, Science, Veterans, and certain other Independent Agencies Appropriation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill making appropriations for the Department of Housing and Urban Development; for space, science, veterans, and certain other independent executive agencies, boards, commissions, and corporations for the fiscal year ending June 30, 1974, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (18)

Date
10/26/1973Public law 93-137.
10/26/1973Signed by President.
10/16/1973Measure presented to President.
10/13/1973Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendment to Senate amendment.
10/13/1973Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report.
10/11/1973Resolving differences -- House actions: House receded and concurred in certain Senate amendments with an amendment.
10/11/1973Conference report agreed to in House: House agreed to conference report.
10/10/1973Conference report filed: Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-569.
09/07/1973Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate receded and concurred in certain House amendments and disagreed to certain House amendments.
09/07/1973Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report, roll call #380 (88-0).
08/01/1973Resolving differences -- House actions: House receded and concurred in certain Senate amendments.
08/01/1973Conference report agreed to in House: House agreed to conference report, roll call #412 (401-9).
07/27/1973Conference report filed: Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-411.
06/30/1973Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #266 (73-1).
06/28/1973Reported to Senate from the Committee on Appropriations with amendment, S. Rept. 93-272.
06/22/1973Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, roll call #271 (316-21).
06/19/1973Reported to House from the Committee on Appropriations, H. Rept. 93-296.
06/19/1973Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber
10/26/1973Public law 93-137.
10/26/1973Signed by President.
10/16/1973HouseMeasure presented to President.
10/13/1973SenateSenate agreed to House amendment to Senate amendment.
10/13/1973SenateSenate agreed to conference report.
10/11/1973HouseHouse receded and concurred in certain Senate amendments with an amendment.
10/11/1973HouseHouse agreed to conference report.
10/10/1973HouseConference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-569.
09/26/1973HouseHouse requested further conference with Senate.
09/07/1973SenateSenate requested further conference with House.
09/07/1973SenateSenate receded and concurred in certain House amendments and disagreed to certain House amendments.
09/07/1973SenateSenate agreed to conference report, roll call #380 (88-0).
08/01/1973HouseHouse receded and concurred in certain Senate amendments.
08/01/1973HouseHouse agreed to conference report, roll call #412 (401-9).
07/27/1973HouseConference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-411.
07/24/1973HouseConference scheduled in House.
06/30/1973SenateConference scheduled in Senate.
06/30/1973SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended, roll call #266 (73-1).
06/28/1973SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Appropriations with amendment, S. Rept. 93-272.
06/25/1973SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Appropriations.
06/22/1973HouseMeasure passed House, roll call #271 (316-21).
06/19/1973HouseReported to House from the Committee on Appropriations, H. Rept. 93-296.
06/19/1973HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Appropriations06/25/1973 Referred to
06/28/1973 Reported by S.Rept 93-272
House Appropriations06/19/1973 Reported by H.Rept 93-296

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.8825. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/19/1973)

Department of Housing and Urban Development; Space, Science, Veterans, and Certain Other Independent Agencies Appropriation Act - Makes appropriations for the Department of Housing and Urban Development; for space science, veterans, and certain other independent executive agencies, boards, commissions, and corporations for the fiscal year ending June 30, 1974.