Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Department of Defense Appropriation Authorization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to authorize appropriations during the fiscal year 1974 for procurement of aircraft, missiles, naval vessels, tracked combat vehicles, torpedoes, and other weapons, and research, development, test, and evaluation for the Armed Forces, and to prescribe the authorized personnel strength for each active duty component and of the Selected Reserve of each Reserve component of the Armed Forces, and the military training student loads, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (12)

Date Actions Overview
11/16/1973Public law 93-155.
11/16/1973Signed by President.
11/07/1973Measure presented to President.
11/05/1973Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report, roll call #476 (69-12).
10/31/1973Conference report agreed to in House: House agreed to conference report.
10/16/1973Conference report filed: Conference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 93-467.
10/13/1973Conference report filed: Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-588.
10/01/1973Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #448 (91-7).
09/06/1973Reported to Senate from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, S. Rept. 93-385.
07/31/1973Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, roll call #411 (367-37).
07/18/1973Reported to House from the Committee on Armed Services, H. Rept. 93-383.
07/16/1973Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/16/1973Public law 93-155.
11/16/1973Signed by President.
11/07/1973HouseMeasure presented to President.
11/05/1973SenateSenate agreed to conference report, roll call #476 (69-12).
10/31/1973HouseHouse agreed to conference report.
10/16/1973SenateConference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 93-467.
10/13/1973HouseConference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-588.
10/02/1973HouseConference scheduled in House.
10/01/1973SenateConference scheduled in Senate.
10/01/1973SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended, roll call #448 (91-7).
09/06/1973SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, S. Rept. 93-385.
08/01/1973SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Armed Services.
07/31/1973HouseMeasure passed House, amended, roll call #411 (367-37).
07/18/1973HouseReported to House from the Committee on Armed Services, H. Rept. 93-383.
07/16/1973HouseReferred to House Committee on Armed Services.
07/16/1973HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Rep. Bray, William G. [R-IN-6]

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services07/16/1973 Referred to
07/18/1973 Reported by H.Rept 93-383
Senate Armed Services08/01/1973 Referred to
09/06/1973 Reported by S.Rept 93-385

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.9286. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 93-155 (11/16/1973)

(LATEST SUMMARY)

Department of Defense Appropriation Authorization Act - Authorizes appropriations during the fiscal year 1974 for procurement of aircraft, missiles, tracked combat vehicles, torpedoes, and other weapons, and research, development, test and evaluation for the Armed Forces.

Prescribes the authorized personnel strength for each active duty component and of the Selected Reserve of each reserve component of the Armed Forces and the military training student loads.

Establishes the Defense Manpower Commission, composed of seven members, to conduct a study of the manpower requirements of the Department of Defense on both a short-term and long-term basis, giving special consideration to enumerated factors, including: (1) the effectiveness with which civilian and active duty personnel are utilized, and (2) whether the pay structure, including fringe benefits, is adequate and equitable at all levels.

Authorizes, within specified limitations, the Secretary of Defense to assist the Department of Health, Education, and Welfare and the Department of Transportation in providing medical emergency helicopter transportation services to civilians.

Empowers the Secretary of each military department to detail commissioned officers of the Armed Forces as students at accredited law schools. Limits such offers to 25 in any single fiscal year. Sets forth the eligibility requirements to be met by any officer and the competitive procedure for his selection. States that no agreement detailing any officer to an accredited law school may be made during periods when the President is authorized by law to induct persons into the armed forces involuntarily.

Directs the Secretary of Health, Education and Welfare to take action to assure that specified hospitals of the Public Health Service continue in operation, continue to provide care for authorized persons and continue to conduct activities at January 1, 1973 levels.