Summary: H.Con.Res.425 — 93rd Congress (1973-1974)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (02/06/1974)

(LATEST SUMMARY)

Provides that when the House adjourns on Thursday, February 7, 1974, it stand adjourned until 12 o'clock meridian, Wednesday, February 13, 1974; and that when the Senate adjourns on Friday, February 8, 1974, it stand adjourned until 12 o'clock meridian, Monday, February 18, 1974.