Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Joint resolution making an urgent supplemental appropriation for the fiscal year ending June 30, 1974, for the Veterans' Administration, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
04/11/1974Public law 93-261.
04/11/1974Signed by President.
04/02/1974Measure presented to President.
03/29/1974Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate.
03/28/1974Reported to Senate from the Committee on Appropriations, S. Rept. 93-759.
03/27/1974Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, roll call #116 (398-0).
03/26/1974Reported to House from the Committee on Appropriations, H. Rept. 93-951.
03/19/1974Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
04/11/1974Public law 93-261.
04/11/1974Signed by President.
04/02/1974HouseMeasure presented to President.
03/29/1974SenateMeasure passed Senate.
03/28/1974SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Appropriations, S. Rept. 93-759.
03/28/1974SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Appropriations.
03/27/1974HouseMeasure passed House, roll call #116 (398-0).
03/26/1974HouseReported to House from the Committee on Appropriations, H. Rept. 93-951.
03/19/1974HouseReferred to House Committee on Appropriations.
03/19/1974HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations03/19/1974 Referred to
03/26/1974 Reported by H.Rept 93-951
Senate Appropriations03/28/1974 Referred to
03/28/1974 Reported by S.Rept 93-759

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.941. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/19/1974)

Makes appropriations for the fiscal year ending June 30, 1974, for Veterans Administration "Readjustment benefits", $750,000,000.