Summary: S.1494 — 93rd Congress (1973-1974)All Information (Except Text)

There is one summary for S.1494. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/05/1973)

Increases, under the Central Intelligence Agency Retirement Act, the number of participants retiring on an annuity to twenty-one hundred between July 1, 1969 and June 30, 1974 (formerly limited to eight hundred).

Makes the limitation on the number of retirements fifteen hundred for the period beginning July 1, 1974, and ending June 30, 1979. (Amends 50 U.S.C. 403)