Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Fire Prevention and Control Act

Official Titles

Official Title as Enacted

An Act to reduce losses of life and property, through better fire prevention and control, and for other purposes.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish a U.S. Fire Administration and a National Fire Academy in the Department of Housing and Urban Development, to assist State and local governments in reducing the incidence of death, personal injury, and property damage from fire, to increase the effectiveness and coordination of fire prevention and control agencies at all levels of government.


Actions Overview (13)

Date Actions Overview
10/29/1974Public law 93-498.
10/29/1974Signed by President.
10/17/1974Measure presented to President.
10/10/1974Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report.
10/09/1974Conference report agreed to in House: House agreed to conference report, roll call #592 (381-3).
10/02/1974Conference report filed: Conference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 93-1211.
10/02/1974Conference report filed: Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-1413.
08/13/1974Conference report filed: Conference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 93-1088.
08/12/1974Conference report filed: Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-1277.
04/29/1974Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 11989.
11/02/1973Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #475 (62-7).
10/18/1973Reported to Senate from the Committee on Commerce with amendment, S. Rept. 93-470.
05/09/1973Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/29/1974Public law 93-498.
10/29/1974Signed by President.
10/17/1974SenateMeasure presented to President.
10/10/1974SenateSenate agreed to conference report.
10/09/1974HouseHouse agreed to conference report, roll call #592 (381-3).
10/02/1974SenateConference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 93-1211.
10/02/1974HouseConference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-1413.
10/01/1974SenateConference report recommitted to Committee of Conference.
08/13/1974SenateConference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 93-1088.
08/12/1974HouseConference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-1277.
05/15/1974HouseConference scheduled in House.
05/08/1974SenateConference scheduled in Senate.
04/29/1974HouseMeasure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 11989.
11/05/1973HouseReferred to House Committee on Science and Astronautics.
11/02/1973SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended, roll call #475 (62-7).
10/18/1973SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Commerce with amendment, S. Rept. 93-470.
05/09/1973SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Commerce.

Cosponsors (23)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce05/09/1973 Referred to
10/18/1973 Reported by S.Rept 93-470
House Science and Astronautics11/05/1973 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1769. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 93-498 (10/29/1974)

(LATEST SUMMARY)

Federal Fire Prevention and Control Act - Establishes in the Department of Commerce the National Fire Prevention and Control Administration. Provides that the Administrator of such agency shall be appointed by the President with Senate approval.

Authorizes the Administrator to take all steps necessary to educate the public and to overcome public indifference as to fire and fire prevention.

Directs the Secretary of Commerce to establish the National Academy for Fire Prevention and Control for the purpose of advancing the professional development of fire service personnel and of other persons engaged in fire prevention and control activities. Provides that the Academy shall be headed by a superintendent appointed by the Secretary. Sets forth the powers of the Superintendent.

Directs the Administrator to conduct a continuing program of development, testing, and evaluation of equipment for use by the Nation's fire, rescue, and civil defense services, with the aim of making available improved suppression, protective, auxiliary, and warning devices incorporating the latest technology.

Enumerates management studies in the area of fire prevention and control which the Administrator is authorized to conduct.

Provides that the Administrator shall operate, directly or through contracts or grants, an integrated, comprehensive National Fire Data Center for the selection, analysis, publication, and dissemination of information related to the prevention, occurrence, control, and results of fires of all types.

Requires the Administrator to establish master plan demonstration projects resulting in the planning and implementation of a comprehensive master plan for fire protection for each State for which the plan is funded. Sets forth the application procedure to be followed by the States in applying for funds for the establishment of such projects. Authorizes appropriations for such grants.

Provides that each fire service that engaged in the fighting of a fire on property which is under the jurisdiction of the United States may file a claim with the Administrator for the amount of direct expenses and direct losses incurred by such fire service as a result of fighting such fire.

Authorizes the Administrator to review, evaluate, and suggest improvements in State and local fire prevention codes, building codes, and any relevant Federal or private codes and regulations.

Authorizes the Administrator to encourage owners and managers of residential multiple-unit, commercial, industrial, and transportation structures to prepare Fire Safety Effectiveness Statements, pursuant to standards, forms, rules, and regulations to be developed and issued by the Administrator.

Establishes the President's Award for Outstanding Public Safety Service and the Secretary's Award for Distinguished Public Safety Service.

Sets forth reporting requirements with respect to the implementation of this Act.

Establishes within the Department of Commerce a Fire Research Center which shall have the mission of performing and supporting research on all aspects of fire with the aim of providing scientific and technical knowledge applicable to the prevention and control of fires. Sets forth areas of research to be included in the fire research program conducted by the Center.

Directs the Secretary of Health, Education, and Welfare to establish, within the National Institutes of Health and in cooperation with the Secretary, an expanded program of research on burns, treatment of burn injuries, and rehabilitation of victims of fires.

Requires the National Institutes of Health to: (1) sponsor and encourage the establishment throughout the Nation of twenty-five additional burn centers, which shall comprise separate hospital facilities providing specialized burn treatment and including research and teaching program, and twenty-five additional burn units, which shall comprise specialized facilities in general hospitals used only for burn victims; (2) provide training and continuing support of specialists to staff the new burn centers and burn units; (3) sponsor and enourage the establishment of ninety burn programs in general hospitals which comprise staffs of burn injury specialist; (4) provide special training in emergency care for burn victims; (5) augment sponsorship of research on burns and burn treatment; (6) administer and support a systematic program of research concerning smoke inhalation injuries; and (7) sponsor and support other research and training programs in the treatment and rehabilitation of burn injury victims.

Authorizes appropriations to carry out the program for victims of fire.