As of 08/02/2021 text has not been received for S.1988 - Interim Fisheries Zone Extension and Management Act

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Interim Fisheries Zone Extension and Management Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to extend on an interim basis the jurisdiction of the United States over certain ocean areas and fish in order to protect the domestic fishing industry.


Actions Overview (5)

Date Actions Overview
12/11/1974Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call # 526 (68-27).
11/27/1974Reported to Senate from the Committee on Armed Services, S. Rept. 93-1300.
09/23/1974Reported to Senate from the Committee on Foreign Relations unfavorably, S. Rept. 93-1166.
08/08/1974Reported to Senate from the Committee on Commerce with amendment, S. Rept. 93-1079.
06/13/1973Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/12/1974HouseReferred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
12/11/1974SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended, roll call # 526 (68-27).
11/27/1974SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Armed Services, S. Rept. 93-1300.
09/30/1974SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Armed Services.
09/23/1974SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Foreign Relations unfavorably, S. Rept. 93-1166.
08/08/1974SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Foreign Relations.
08/08/1974SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Commerce with amendment, S. Rept. 93-1079.
06/13/1973SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Commerce.

Cosponsors (20)


Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Commerce06/13/1973 Referred to
08/08/1974 Reported by S.Rept 93-1079
Senate Foreign Relations08/08/1974 Referred to
09/23/1974 Reported by S.Rept 93-1166
Senate Armed Services09/30/1974 Referred to
11/27/1974 Reported by S.Rept 93-1300
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries12/12/1974 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1988. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (12/11/1974)

(LATEST SUMMARY)

Emergency Marine Fisheries Protection Act - Declares the purposes of this Act, including: to take emergency action to protect specified fishes until an international agreement on fishery jurisdiction comes into force. Defines the terms used in this Act.

Establishes a fishery zone contiguous to the territorial sea of the United States in which exclusive fishery management responsibility and authority shall be exercised. Sets the limits of such zone. States that such authority, with respect to anadromous species, extends to such species wherever found throughout the migratory range of such species, except it shall not extend to within the territorial waters or contiguous fishery zone of any other nation.

Provides that the United States shall manage and conserve, and have perferential rights to fish within the contiguous fishery zone. Authorizes the Secretary of Commerce and the Secretary of State to authorize fishing within the contiguous fishery zone of the United States. Provides that the allowable level of traditional foreign fishing shall be set upon the basis of the portion of any stock which cannot be harvested by citizens of the United States.

Makes it unlawful for any non-citizen of the U.S. to own or operate a fishing vessel engaged in fishing in the contiguous fishery zone of the U.S. or for anadromous species of fish.

Establishes a Fisheries Management Council consisting of 11 members. Sets forth the powers and functions of the Council with respect to marine fisheries management and conservation.

Requires the Secretary of State to initiate and conduct negotiations with any foreign nation which is engaged in, or whose citizens are engaged in, fishing in the contiguous fishery zone of the United States or for anadromous species for the purpose of entering into agreements to effectuate the purposes, policy, and provisions of this Act relating to the management and conservation of fishes.

Declares it to be the sense of Congress that the U.S. Government shall not recognize the contiguous fishery zone limits of any foreign nation beyond 12 nautical miles unless such nation recognizes specified traditional fishing rights of citizens of the United States.

Prohibits specified activities in contravention of this Act. Imposes civil penalties, (of up to $25,000 per day), criminal penalties, and civil forfeiture penalties for violations of this Act.

Provides for the enforcement of the provisions of this Act, conferring exclusive jurisdiction on the district courts of the United States over all cases or controversies arising under this Act.

Authorizes appropriations for carrying out the provisions of this Act.

Authorizes the Secretary of Commerce, under the Fish and Wildlife Act of 1956, to: (1) compensate owners and operators whose fishing vessels or gear have been destroyed by foreign fishing vessels operating in waters superjacent to the Continental Shelf of the United States; and (2) investigate each incident as a result of which such a loan is made.