Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the EURATOM Cooperation Act of 1958, as amended.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
08/14/1973Public law 93-88.
08/14/1973Signed by President.
08/03/1973Measure presented to President.
07/30/1973Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House.
07/26/1973Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate.
07/24/1973Reported to Senate from the Joint Committee on Atomic Energy, S. Rept. 93-341.
06/13/1973Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date Chamber
08/14/1973Public law 93-88.
08/14/1973Signed by President.
08/03/1973SenateMeasure presented to President.
07/30/1973HouseMeasure passed House.
07/26/1973SenateMeasure passed Senate.
07/24/1973SenateReported to Senate from the Joint Committee on Atomic Energy, S. Rept. 93-341.
06/13/1973SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Atomic Energy.

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Joint Atomic Energy06/13/1973 Referred to
07/24/1973 Reported by S.Rept 93-341

No related bill information was received for S.1993.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1993. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/13/1973)

Authorizes the Atomic Energy Commission to sell or lease to the European Atomic Energy Community an anount of contained uranium 235 which does not exceed that necessary to support the fuel cycle of power reactors located within the community having a total installed capacity of 35,000 megawatts of electric energy, together with 25,000 kilograms of contained uranium 235 for other purposes.