Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the disposal of opium from the national stockpile.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
12/28/1973Public law 93-218.
12/28/1973Signed by President.
12/20/1973Measure presented to President.
12/19/1973Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendments.
12/18/1973Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, roll call #699 (270-122).
12/12/1973Reported to House from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, H. Rept. 93-720.
07/28/1973Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate.
07/27/1973Reported to Senate from the Committee on Armed Services, S. Rept. 93-354.
07/12/1973Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/28/1973Public law 93-218.
12/28/1973Signed by President.
12/20/1973SenateMeasure presented to President.
12/19/1973SenateSenate agreed to House amendments.
12/18/1973HouseMeasure passed House, amended, roll call #699 (270-122).
12/12/1973HouseReported to House from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, H. Rept. 93-720.
07/30/1973HouseReferred to House Committee on Armed Services.
07/28/1973SenateMeasure passed Senate.
07/27/1973SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Armed Services, S. Rept. 93-354.
07/12/1973SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Armed Services.

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Armed Services07/12/1973 Referred to
07/27/1973 Reported by S.Rept 93-354
House Armed Services07/30/1973 Referred to
12/12/1973 Reported by H.Rept 93-720

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2166. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 93-218 (12/28/1973)

(LATEST SUMMARY)

Authorizes the disposal of approximately 75,700 pounds of opium from the national stockpile.