Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend Public Law 93-60 to increase the authorization for appropriations to the Atomic Energy Commission in accordance with Section 261 of the Atomic Energy Act of 1954, as amended, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
11/26/1973Public law 93-158.
11/26/1973Signed by President.
11/14/1973Measure presented to President.
11/13/1973Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, in lieu of H.R. 11216.
11/09/1973Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate.
11/07/1973Reported to Senate from the Joint Committee on Atomic Energy, S. Rept. 93-487.
11/02/1973Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/26/1973Public law 93-158.
11/26/1973Signed by President.
11/14/1973SenateMeasure presented to President.
11/13/1973HouseMeasure passed House, in lieu of H.R. 11216.
11/09/1973SenateMeasure passed Senate.
11/07/1973SenateReported to Senate from the Joint Committee on Atomic Energy, S. Rept. 93-487.
11/02/1973SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Atomic Energy.

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Joint Atomic Energy11/02/1973 Referred to
11/07/1973 Reported by S.Rept 93-487

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2645. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (11/02/1973)

Increases, under the Atomic Enegry Act, the authorization for appropriations to the Atomic Energy Commission from $1,740,750,000 to $1,751,450,000. Allots $30,000,000 for additional waste concentration and salt cake storage facilities in Richland, Washington.