Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

International Ocean Exposition Appropriations Authorization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize appropriations for United States participation in the International Ocean Exposition '75.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
06/08/1974Public law 93-304.
06/08/1974Signed by President.
05/30/1974Measure presented to President.
05/29/1974Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House.
03/11/1974Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
02/28/1974Reported to Senate from the Committee on Foreign Relations with amendment, S. Rept. 93-700.
11/07/1973Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber
06/08/1974Public law 93-304.
06/08/1974Signed by President.
05/30/1974SenateMeasure presented to President.
05/29/1974HouseMeasure passed House.
03/12/1974HouseReferred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
03/11/1974SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
02/28/1974SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Foreign Relations with amendment, S. Rept. 93-700.
11/07/1973SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (1)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR]

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations11/07/1973 Referred to
02/28/1974 Reported by S.Rept 93-700
House Foreign Affairs03/12/1974 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.2662.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2662. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 93-304 (06/08/1974)

(LATEST SUMMARY)

International Ocean Exposition Appropriations Authorization Act - Authorizes to be appropriated $5,600,000 for the United States Information Agency for "Special International Exhibitions", for United States participation in the International Ocean Exposition to be held in Okinawa, Japan.