There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Title as Enacted

An Act to provide for increased participation by the United States in the International Development Association and to permit United States citizens to purchase, hold, sell, or otherwise deal with gold in the United States or abroad.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for increased participation by the United States in the International Development Association.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
08/14/1974Public law 93-373.
08/14/1974Signed by President.
08/02/1974Measure presented to President.
07/31/1974Resolving differences -- House actions: House agreed to Senate amendments to House amendments.
07/30/1974Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendments with an amendment.
07/25/1974Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendments.
07/02/1974Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 15465.
05/29/1974Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #218 (55-27).
05/09/1974Reported to Senate from the Committee on Foreign Relations with amendment, S. Rept. 93-834.

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/14/1974Public law 93-373.
08/14/1974Signed by President.
08/02/1974SenateMeasure presented to President.
07/31/1974HouseHouse agreed to Senate amendments to House amendments.
07/31/1974SenateSenate took from desk and sent to House.
07/30/1974SenateMeasure held at desk.
07/30/1974SenateSenate agreed to House amendments with an amendment.
07/30/1974SenateSenate vitiated its action of 7/25/1974.
07/25/1974SenateSenate agreed to House amendments.
07/02/1974HouseMeasure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 15465.
05/30/1974HouseReferred to House Committee on Banking and Currency.
05/29/1974SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended, roll call #218 (55-27).
05/09/1974SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Foreign Relations with amendment, S. Rept. 93-834.
11/07/1973SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (21)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Foreign Relations11/07/1973 Referred to
05/09/1974 Reported by S.Rept 93-834
House Banking and Currency05/30/1974 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2665. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 93-373 (08/14/1974)

(LATEST SUMMARY)

Authorizes to be appropriated without fiscal year limitation four annual installments of $375,000,000 each for payment by the Secretary of the Treasury to the International Development Association.

Requires the United States vote in the International Development Association to be cast against loans to any countries which do not sign the Nuclear Nonproliferation Treaty.

Repeals the prohibitions on purchasing, holding, selling, or otherwise dealing in gold in the United States or abroad, effective either on December 31, 1974, or at any time prior to such date that the President finds and reports to Congress that private ownership of gold will not adversely affect the U.S. monetary position.