Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend chapter 5 of title 37, United States Code, to revise the special pay structure relating to medical officers of the uniformed services.


Actions Overview (11)

Date Actions Overview
05/06/1974Public law 93-274.
05/06/1974Signed by President.
04/24/1974Measure presented to President.
04/23/1974Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report.
04/23/1974Conference report agreed to in House: House agreed to conference report, roll call #172 (372-17).
04/10/1974Conference report filed: Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-984.
04/02/1974Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, roll call #131 (291-106).
03/07/1974Reported to House from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, H. Rept. 93-883.
12/20/1973Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
12/19/1973Reported to Senate from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, S. Rept. 93-658.
12/04/1973Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/06/1974Public law 93-274.
05/06/1974Signed by President.
04/24/1974SenateMeasure presented to President.
04/23/1974SenateSenate agreed to conference report.
04/23/1974HouseHouse agreed to conference report, roll call #172 (372-17).
04/10/1974HouseConference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-984.
04/08/1974HouseConference scheduled in House.
04/04/1974SenateConference scheduled in Senate.
04/02/1974HouseMeasure passed House, amended, roll call #131 (291-106).
03/07/1974HouseReported to House from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, H. Rept. 93-883.
12/21/1973HouseReferred to House Committee on Armed Services.
12/20/1973SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
12/19/1973SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, S. Rept. 93-658.
12/04/1973SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Armed Services.

Cosponsors (1)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Sen. Tunney, John V. [D-CA]

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Armed Services12/04/1973 Referred to
12/19/1973 Reported by S.Rept 93-658
House Armed Services12/21/1973 Referred to
03/07/1974 Reported by H.Rept 93-883

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2770. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 93-274 (05/06/1974)

(LATEST SUMMARY)

Provides that an officer of the Army or Navy in the Medical Corps, an officer of the Air Force who is designated as a medical officer, or a medical officer of the Public Health Service, who is on active duty for a period of at least one year is entitled, in addition to any other pay or allowances, to special pay at the following rates: (1) $100 a month for each month of active duty if he has not completed two years of active duty in a category named above; or (2) $350 a month for each month of active duty if he has completed two years of active duty. Provides special pay for Army, Navy, Air Force, and Public Health dental officers.

Provides for special pay for officers of the Armed Forces in health professions who execute active duty agreements. States that upon acceptance of such agreement by the Secretary concerned such officer is entitled to an amount not to exceed $10,000 for each year of the active duty agreement. Provides that such officer must be qualified in a critical health profession and qualified, as determined by a board composed of officers in his profession, to enter into such an agreement. Requires the Secretary of Defense and the Secretary of Health, Education, and Welfare to submit a written report each year to the Committee on Armed Services of the Senate and the House of Representatives regarding the operation of this program.