Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to help preserve the separation of powers and to further the constitutional prerogatives of Congress by providing for congressional review of executive agreements.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
11/21/1974Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
11/18/1974Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment, S. Rept. 93-1286.
08/19/1974Committee on Foreign Relations discharged in Senate.
07/30/1974Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/25/1974HouseReferred to House Committee on Rules.
11/21/1974SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
11/18/1974SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment, S. Rept. 93-1286.
08/19/1974SenateRereferred to Committee on the Judiciary.
08/19/1974SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations discharged in Senate.
07/30/1974SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Foreign Relations07/30/1974 Referred to
08/19/1974 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary08/19/1974 Referred to
11/18/1974 Reported by S.Rept 93-1286
House Rules11/25/1974 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.3830.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3830. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/30/1974)

Requires that any international executive agreement made by the executive branch shall be transmitted to the Congress, which may act within 60 days to disapprove it.

Sets forth procedures for such consideration by the Congress.