Summary: S.38 — 93rd Congress (1973-1974)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 93-44 (06/18/1973)

(LATEST SUMMARY)

Airport Development Acceleration Act - Expands the definition of "airport development" under the Airport and Airway Development Act of 1970 to include the acquisition, improvement, or repair of safety equipment required by rule or regulation for certification of the airport under the Federal Aviation Act of 1958, and security equipment required of the sponsor by rule or regulation of the Federal Aviation Administration for the safety and security of persons and property on the airport.

Authorizes the Secretary of Transportation to make grants for development totaling $275,000,000 for each of the fiscal years 1974 and 1975. Authorizes the Secretary to make grants for the purpose of developing airports serving segments of aviation other than air carriers certificated by the Civil Aeronautics Board totaling $95,000,000 for each of the fiscal years 1974 and 1975.

Increases the total obligational authority of the Secretary to make grants for airport development to $1,460,000,000. Provides that no such obligation shall be incurred after June 30, 1975.

States that such obligations shall not be liquidated in an aggregate amount exceeding $1,150,000,000 prior to June 30, 1974, and an aggregate amount exceeding $1,460,000,000 prior to June 30, 1975.

Provides that the Federal share of allowable project costs incurred under the Airport and Airway Development Act of 1970 shall be: (1) fifty percent for sponsors whose airports enplane not less than 1.00 percent of the total annual passengers enplaned by air carriers certificated by the Board; and (2) seventy-five percent for sponsors whose airports enplane less than 1.00 percent of such passengers and for sponsors of general aviation of reliever airports.

Provides that, to the extent that the project cost of an approved project for airport development is required under the Federal Aviation Act of 1958, the United States share shall be 82 percent of the allowable cost thereof with respect to airport development project grant agreements entered into after May 10, 1971.

States that, to the extent that the project cost of an approved project for airport development represents the cost of security equipment required by the Secretary by rule or regulation, the United States share shall be 82 percent of the allowable cost thereof with respect to airport development project grants agreements entered into after September 28, 1971.

Provides that the Secretary is to prepare and publish within three years after May 30, 1970, and thereafter to review and revise, as necessary, a national airport system plan for the development of public airports in the United States.

Provides that no State shall levy or collect a tax, fee, head charge, or other charge, directly or indirectly, on persons traveling in air transportation or on the carriage of persons in air transportation, or on the gross receipts derived therefrom.