Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Title as Enacted

An Act to amend the Rural Electrification Act of 1936, as amended, to establish a Rural Electrification and Telephone Revolving Fund to provide adequate funds for rural electric and telephone systems through insured and guaranteed loans at interest rates which will allow them to achieve the objectives of the Act, and for other purposes.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Rural Electrification Act of 1936, as amended, to reaffirm that such funds made available for each fiscal year to carry out the programs provided for in such act be fully obligated in said year, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (11)

Date Actions Overview
05/11/1973Public law 93-32.
05/11/1973Signed by President.
05/11/1973Measure presented to President.
05/10/1973Conference report agreed to in House: House agreed to conference report, roll call #134 (363-25).
05/09/1973Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report, roll call #124 (93-3).
05/09/1973Conference report filed: Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-169.
04/04/1973Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 5683.
04/04/1973Committee on Agriculture discharged in House.
02/21/1973Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, roll call #23 (69-20).
02/15/1973Reported to Senate from the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry, S. Rept. 93-20.
01/16/1973Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/11/1973Public law 93-32.
05/11/1973Signed by President.
05/11/1973SenateMeasure presented to President.
05/10/1973HouseHouse agreed to conference report, roll call #134 (363-25).
05/09/1973SenateSenate agreed to conference report, roll call #124 (93-3).
05/09/1973HouseConference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-169.
04/06/1973SenateConference scheduled in Senate.
04/04/1973HouseConference scheduled in House.
04/04/1973HouseMeasure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 5683.
04/04/1973HouseCommittee on Agriculture discharged in House.
02/22/1973HouseReferred to House Committee on Agriculture.
02/21/1973SenateMeasure passed Senate, roll call #23 (69-20).
02/15/1973SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry, S. Rept. 93-20.
01/16/1973SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Agriculture and Forestry.

Cosponsors (54)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Sen. Allen, James B. [D-AL]
Sen. Aiken, George [R-VT]
Sen. Abourezk, James [D-SD]
Sen. Nelson, Gaylord [D-WI]
Sen. Mondale, Walter F. [D-MN]
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]
Sen. Eagleton, Thomas F. [D-MO]
Sen. McGovern, George [D-SD]
Sen. McGee, Gale W. [D-WY]
Sen. Bellmon, Henry L. [R-OK]
Sen. Clark, Dick [D-IA]
Sen. Huddleston, Walter (Dee) [D-KY]
Sen. McIntyre, Thomas J. [D-NH]
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL]
Sen. Hughes, Harold E. [D-IA]
Sen. Sparkman, John J. [D-AL]
Sen. Young, Milton R. [R-ND]
Sen. Hathaway, William D. [D-ME]
Sen. Muskie, Edmund S. [D-ME]
Sen. Gravel, Mike [D-AK]
Sen. Pearson, James B. [R-KS]
Sen. Fulbright, James [D-AR]
Sen. Metcalf, Lee [D-MT]
Sen. Moss, Frank E. [D-UT]
Sen. Cannon, Howard W. [D-NV]
Sen. Haskell, Floyd K. [D-CO]
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]
Sen. Bible, Alan [D-NV]
Sen. Tunney, John V. [D-CA]
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]
Sen. Stevenson, Adlai E., III [D-IL]
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]
Sen. Hartke, Vance [D-IN]
Sen. Church, Frank [D-ID]
Sen. Talmadge, Herman E. [D-GA]
Sen. Gurney, Edward J. [R-FL]
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]
Sen. Mansfield, Mike [D-MT]
Sen. Ervin, Sam J., Jr. [D-NC]
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX]
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]
Sen. Montoya, Joseph M. [D-NM]
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS]
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]
Sen. Randolph, Jennings [D-WV]
Sen. Scott, Hugh [R-PA]
Sen. Williams, Harrison A., Jr. [D-NJ]
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]
Sen. Hart, Philip A. [D-MI]
Sen. Schweiker, Richard S. [R-PA]
Sen. Bayh, Birch [D-IN]
Sen. Symington, Stuart [D-MO]

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Agriculture and Forestry01/16/1973 Referred to
02/15/1973 Reported by S.Rept 93-20
House Agriculture02/22/1973 Referred to
04/04/1973 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.394. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 93-32 (05/11/1973)

(LATEST SUMMARY)

Establishes in the Treasury of the United States the Rural Electrification and Telephone Revolving Fund.

Sets forth the purposes for which the assets of the fund are to be made available.

Authorizes the Administrator of the Rural Electrification Administration to make and issue interim notes to the Secretary of the Treasury for the purpose of obtaining funds necessary for discharging obligations of the fund and for making loans, advances, and authorized expenditures out of the fund.

Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to purchase for resale obligations insured through the fund when offered by the Administrator.

Authorizes the Administrator to make insured loans to the full extent of the assets available in the fund subject only to limitations as to amounts authorized for loans and advances as may be from time to time imposed by the Congress.

States that insured loans shall bear interest at a special rate of two percent, per annum or a standard rate of five percent per annum. Establishes requirements for eligibility for the special rate.

Allows the Administrator to provide financial assistance to borrowers for the purposes provided in the Rural Electrification Act by guaranteeing loans, in the full amount thereof, made by the Rural Telephone Bank, National Rural Utilities Cooperative Finance Corporation, and any other legally organized lending agency, or by accommodating as subordinating liens or mortgages in the fund held by the Administrator as owner or as trustee or custodian for purchases of notes from the fund, or by any combination of such guarantee, accommodation, or subordination.