Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide price support for milk at not less than 90 percent of the parity price therefor.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
01/04/1975Pocket vetoed by President.
12/24/1974Measure presented to President.
12/20/1974Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, roll call #726 (205-58).
12/19/1974Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
12/18/1974Reported to Senate from the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry with amendment, S. Rept. 93-1411.
12/04/1974Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date Chamber
01/04/1975Pocket vetoed by President.
12/24/1974SenateMeasure presented to President.
12/20/1974HouseMeasure passed House, roll call #726 (205-58).
12/19/1974SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
12/18/1974SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry with amendment, S. Rept. 93-1411.
12/04/1974SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Agriculture and Forestry.

Cosponsors (7)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Sen. Aiken, George [R-VT]
Sen. Young, Milton R. [R-ND]
Sen. Clark, Dick [D-IA]
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]
Sen. Huddleston, Walter (Dee) [D-KY]
Sen. Nelson, Gaylord [D-WI]
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Agriculture12/04/1974 Referred to
12/18/1974 Reported by S.Rept 93-1411

No related bill information was received for S.4206.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.4206. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/20/1974)

(LATEST SUMMARY)

Provides that the price of milk shall be supported at not less than 85 percent of the parity price for the period beginning on the date of enactment of this Act and ending March 31, 1976.

Expresses the sense of Congress that the President take appropriate action to assure that meat and meat product imports not exceed the adjusted base for the current year and that import quotas of selected dairy products not exceed the levels prevailing as of June 1, 1971, as authorized by the Agricultural Adjustment Act of 1933.