Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution on national American Indian policy.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/29/1974Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate.
05/21/1974Reported to Senate from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs, S. Rept. 93-864.
06/28/1973Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date Chamber
05/30/1974HouseReferred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
05/29/1974SenateMeasure passed Senate.
05/21/1974SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs, S. Rept. 93-864.
06/28/1973SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.

Cosponsors (2)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Sen. Nelson, Gaylord [D-WI]
Sen. Abourezk, James [D-SD]

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Interior and Insular Affairs06/28/1973 Referred to
05/21/1974 Reported by S.Rept 93-864
House Interior and Insular Affairs05/30/1974 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.Con.Res.37.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Con.Res.37. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/28/1973)

Makes it the sense of Congress that: (1) our national Indian policy shall give full recognition to and be predicated upon the unique relationship that exists between this group of citizens and the Federal Government and that a governmentwide commitment shall derive from this relationship that will be designed to give Indians the freedom and encouragement to develop their individual, family, and community potential and to determine their own future to the maximum extent possible; (2) this statement of national Indian policy replaces the policy set forth in House Concurrent Resolution 108, Eighty-third Congress (August 1, 1953); (3) improving the quality and quantity of social and economic development efforts for Indian people and maximizing opportunities for Indian control and self-determination shall be a major goal of our national Indian policy; (4) there should be a recognition of Federal responsibility to see that those Indians residing beyond the areas served by special Indian programs and services are given equal consideration with other citizens in the provision of services by other Federal, State, and local agencies. (5) Indian property will be protected, Indian culture and identity will be respected, and Congress will commit and dedicate itself to support a policy of developing the necessary programs and services to bring Indians to a social and economic level of full participating citizens; (6) the Office of Management and Budget should submit an annual report to the Congress showing combined expenditures made by all departments and agencies of the Federal Government for the social and economic betterment of Indians; and (7) as used in this resolution the term "American Indian" or "Indian" shall include "Alaska Natives".