Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution expressing the appreciation of Congress to Vietnam veterans on Veterans Day, 1973.


Actions Overview (5)

Date Actions Overview
10/16/1973Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House.
10/16/1973Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged in House.
10/11/1973Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate.
10/10/1973Reported to Senate from the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, S. Rept. 93-462.
10/04/1973Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/16/1973HouseMeasure passed House.
10/16/1973HouseCommittee on Veterans' Affairs discharged in House.
10/12/1973HouseReferred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
10/11/1973SenateMeasure passed Senate.
10/10/1973SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, S. Rept. 93-462.
10/04/1973SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Cosponsors (31)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Veterans' Affairs10/04/1973 Referred to
10/10/1973 Reported by S.Rept 93-462
House Veterans' Affairs10/12/1973 Referred to
10/16/1973 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for S.Con.Res.51.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Con.Res.51. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (10/04/1973)

Expresses the gratitude and respect of the Congress to Vietnam veterans on Veterans Day 1973 for their gallant part in attaining peace in Vietnam and making it possible to observe Veterans Day 1973 in peace.