Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

Joint resolution designating the premises occupied by the Chief of Naval Operations as the official residence of the Vice President, effective upon the termination of service of the incumbent Chief of Naval Operations.


Actions Overview (10)

Date Actions Overview
07/12/1974Public law 93-346.
07/12/1974Signed by President.
07/03/1974Measure presented to President.
06/28/1974Resolving differences -- House actions: House agreed to Senate amendment to House amendment.
06/26/1974Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendments with an amendment.
06/12/1974Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, roll call #292 (380-23).
06/04/1974Reported to House from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, H. Rept. 93-1079.
05/16/1974Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
05/13/1974Reported to Senate from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, S. Rept. 93-844.
04/03/1974Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/12/1974Public law 93-346.
07/12/1974Signed by President.
07/03/1974SenateMeasure presented to President.
06/28/1974HouseHouse agreed to Senate amendment to House amendment.
06/26/1974SenateSenate agreed to House amendments with an amendment.
06/12/1974HouseMeasure passed House, amended, roll call #292 (380-23).
06/04/1974HouseReported to House from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, H. Rept. 93-1079.
05/20/1974HouseReferred to House Committee on Armed Services.
05/16/1974SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
05/13/1974SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, S. Rept. 93-844.
04/03/1974SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Armed Services.

Cosponsors (34)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Armed Services04/03/1974 Referred to
05/13/1974 Reported by S.Rept 93-844
House Armed Services05/20/1974 Referred to
06/04/1974 Reported by H.Rept 93-1079

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.J.Res.202. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 93-346 (07/12/1974)

(LATEST SUMMARY)

Designates the premises occupied by the Chief of Naval Operations as the official residence of the Vice President, effective upon the termination of service of the incumbent Chief of Naval Operations. Authorizes the Secretary of the Navy to provide for the staffing, care, maintenance, repair, improvement, alteration, and furnishing of the official residence and grounds.

Authorizes to be appropriated such sums as may be necessary to carry out the provisions of this Act.

Expresses the sense of Congress that living accommodations, generally equivalent to those available to the highest ranking officer on active duty in each of the other military services, should be provided for the Chief of Naval Operations.