Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38 of the United States Code to promote the care and treatment of veterans in State veterans' homes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
09/21/1976Public law 94-417.
09/21/1976Signed by President.
09/13/1976Measure presented to President.
09/09/1976Resolving differences -- House actions: House agreed to Senate amendments.
08/30/1976Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
08/25/1976Reported to Senate from the Committee on Veterans' Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 94-1164.
12/15/1975Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House.
12/10/1975Reported to House from the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, H. Rept. 94-705.
10/28/1975Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
09/21/1976Public law 94-417.
09/21/1976Signed by President.
09/13/1976HouseMeasure presented to President.
09/13/1976Measure enrolled in Senate.
09/10/1976Measure enrolled in House.
09/09/1976HouseHouse agreed to Senate amendments.
08/30/1976SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
08/30/1976SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
08/30/1976SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
08/25/1976SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Veterans' Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 94-1164.
12/16/1975SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
12/15/1975HouseMeasure passed House.
12/15/1975HouseMeasure considered in House.
12/15/1975HouseMeasure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
12/10/1975HouseReported to House from the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, H. Rept. 94-705.
10/28/1975HouseReferred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
10/28/1975HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs10/28/1975 Referred to
12/10/1975 Reported by H.Rept 94-705
Senate Veterans' Affairs12/16/1975 Referred to
08/25/1976 Reported by S.Rept 94-1164

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.10394. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (08/25/1976)

(Reported to Senate from the Committee on Veterans' Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 94-1164)

Sets forth a payment schedule for the care and treatment of veterans in State veterans' homes with funds of the Veterans' Administration, in those cases where the veteran would be eligible for the type of care in a Veterans' Administration facility.

Limits such payment in all cases to one-half of the cost of the State home care. Amends 38 U.S.C. 641

Revises the definition of the term "State home" to eliminate references to wartime service in such definition. Amend 38 U.S.C. 101

Provides that such payment schedule be effective from January 1, 1976, and requires that States receive the additional amount of entitlement in a lump sum payment.