Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Supplemental Appropriations Act

Official Titles

Official Title as Enacted

An Act making supplemental appropriations for the fiscal year ending June 30, 1976, and the period ending September 30, 1976, and for other purposes.

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill making supplemental appropriations for the fiscal year ending June 30, 1976, and the period ending September 30, 1976.


Actions Overview (14)

Date
12/18/1975Public law 94-157.
12/18/1975Signed by President.
12/16/1975Measure presented to President.
12/15/1975Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to certain House amendments.
12/15/1975Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report.
12/15/1975Resolving differences -- House actions: House receded and concurred to certain Senate amendments with an amendment.
12/15/1975Resolving differences -- House actions: House receded and concurred in certain Senate amendments.
12/15/1975Conference report agreed to in House: House agreed to conference report, roll call #783 (275-130).
12/12/1975Conference report filed: Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 94-718.
12/10/1975Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #572 (71-24).
12/05/1975Reported to Senate from the Committee on Appropriations with amendments, S. Rept. 94-511.
11/13/1975Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, roll call #699 (334-47).
11/07/1975Reported to House from the Committee on Appropriations, H. Rept. 94-645.
11/07/1975Introduced in House

All Actions (29)

Date Chamber
12/18/1975Public law 94-157.
12/18/1975Signed by President.
12/16/1975HouseMeasure presented to President.
12/16/1975Measure enrolled in Senate.
12/16/1975Measure enrolled in House.
12/15/1975SenateSenate agreed to certain House amendments.
12/15/1975SenateSenate agreed to conference report.
12/15/1975HouseHouse receded and concurred to certain Senate amendments with an amendment.
12/15/1975HouseHouse receded and concurred in certain Senate amendments.
12/15/1975HouseHouse agreed to conference report, roll call #783 (275-130).
12/15/1975HouseMotion to recommit conference report to the Committee of Conference rejected in House, roll call #782 (187-219).
12/12/1975HouseConference report filed in House, H. Rept. 94-718.
12/11/1975HouseConference scheduled in House.
12/10/1975SenateConference scheduled in Senate.
12/10/1975SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended, roll call #572 (71-24).
12/10/1975SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
12/09/1975SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
12/08/1975SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
12/08/1975SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
12/05/1975SenateCloture motion filed in Senate on motion to proceed to consideration (Second Motion).
12/05/1975SenateCloture motion filed in Senate on motion to proceed to consideration.
12/05/1975SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Appropriations with amendments, S. Rept. 94-511.
Action By: Committee on Appropriations
11/14/1975SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Appropriations.
11/13/1975HouseMeasure passed House, amended, roll call #699 (334-47).
11/13/1975HouseMeasure considered in House.
11/13/1975HouseMeasure called up by unanimous consent in House.
11/07/1975HouseReported to House from the Committee on Appropriations, H. Rept. 94-645.
Action By: Committee on Appropriations
11/07/1975HouseReferred to House Committee on Appropriations.
11/07/1975HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations11/07/1975 Referred to
11/07/1975 Reported by H.Rept 94-645
Senate Appropriations11/14/1975 Referred to
12/05/1975 Reported by S.Rept 94-511

No related bill information was received for H.R.10647.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.10647. View summaries

Shown Here:
Conference report filed in House (12/12/1975)

(Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 94-718)

Supplemental Appropriations Act - =Title I= - Makes supplemental appropriations for the fiscal year 1976, for specified executive departments and agencies, the legislative and judicial branches, and for claims and judgments against the United States, including funds for: (1) the Special Milk Program; (2) child nutrition programs; (3) the New York City Seasonal Financing Fund; and (4) the Urban Mass Transportation Fund.

=Title II: General Provisions= - States that no part of the funds appropriated by this Act shall be used during the fiscal year 1976 to make food stamps available to any household, to the extent that the entitlement otherwise available to such household is attributable to an individual who: (1) has reached his eighteenth birthday; (2) is enrolled in an institution of higher education; and (3) is properly claimed as a dependent child for Federal income tax purposes by a taxpayer who is not a member of an eligible household.