Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

United States Information Agency Authorization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to authorize appropriations for the U.S. Information Agency for fiscal year 1976 and for the period July 1, 1976, through September 30, 1976.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
04/21/1976Public law 94-272.
04/21/1976Signed by President.
04/12/1976Measure presented to President.
04/09/1976Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate.
04/07/1976Reported to Senate from the Committee on Foreign Relations, S. Rept. 94-740.
03/24/1976Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, roll call #133 (327-81).
02/25/1976Reported to House from the Committee on International Relations, H. Rept. 94-849.
01/29/1976Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/21/1976Public law 94-272.
04/21/1976Signed by President.
04/12/1976HouseMeasure presented to President.
04/12/1976Measure enrolled in Senate.
04/12/1976Measure enrolled in House.
04/09/1976SenateMeasure passed Senate.
04/09/1976SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
04/09/1976SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
04/07/1976SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Foreign Relations, S. Rept. 94-740.
03/25/1976SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Foreign Relations.
03/24/1976HouseMeasure passed House, amended, roll call #133 (327-81).
03/24/1976HouseMeasure considered in House.
03/24/1976HouseMeasure called up by special rule in House.
02/25/1976HouseReported to House from the Committee on International Relations, H. Rept. 94-849.
01/29/1976HouseReferred to House Committee on International Relations.
01/29/1976HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations01/29/1976 Referred to
02/25/1976 Reported by H.Rept 94-849
Senate Foreign Relations03/25/1976 Referred to
04/07/1976 Reported by S.Rept 94-740

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.11598. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/29/1976)

Authorizes the appropriation of $331,687,000 for the United States Information Agency to carry out international informational activities and programs under the United States Information and Educational Exchange Act of 1948, the Mutual Educational and Cultural Exchange Act of 1961, and the Reorganization Plan Numbered 8 of 1953.