Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to rescind certain budget authority recommended in the message of the President of January 23, 1976 (H. Doc. 94-342), transmitted pursuant to the Impoundment Control Act of 1974.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
03/25/1976Public law 94-249.
03/25/1976Signed by President.
03/15/1976Measure presented to President.
03/11/1976Resolving differences -- House actions: House agreed to Senate amendments.
02/26/1976Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
02/23/1976Reported to Senate from the Committee on Appropriations with amendment, S. Rept. 94-640.
02/10/1976Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended.
02/05/1976Reported to House from the Committee on Appropriations with amendment, H. Rept. 94-808.
02/03/1976Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
03/25/1976Public law 94-249.
03/25/1976Signed by President.
03/15/1976HouseMeasure presented to President.
03/15/1976Measure enrolled in Senate.
03/15/1976Measure enrolled in House.
03/11/1976HouseHouse agreed to Senate amendments.
02/26/1976SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
02/26/1976SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
02/26/1976SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
02/23/1976SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Appropriations with amendment, S. Rept. 94-640.
02/16/1976SenateReferred jointly to Senate Committees on Labor and Public Welfare; Armed Services; and Foreign Relations.
02/16/1976SenateReferred jointly to Senate Committees on Appropriations; the Budget; and Commerce.
02/10/1976HouseMeasure passed House, amended.
02/10/1976HouseMeasure considered in House.
02/10/1976HouseMeasure called up by unanimous consent in House.
02/05/1976HouseReported to House from the Committee on Appropriations with amendment, H. Rept. 94-808.
02/03/1976HouseReferred to House Committee on Appropriations.
02/03/1976HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (7)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations02/03/1976 Referred to
02/05/1976 Reported by H.Rept 94-808
Senate Appropriations02/16/1976 Referred to
02/23/1976 Reported by S.Rept 94-640
Senate Budget02/16/1976 Referred to
Senate Commerce02/16/1976 Referred to
Senate Armed Services02/16/1976 Referred to
Senate Foreign Relations02/16/1976 Referred to
Senate Labor and Public Welfare02/16/1976 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.11665.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.11665. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (02/23/1976)

(Reported to Senate from the Committee on Appropriations with amendment, S. Rept. 94-640)

Rescinds budget authority: (1) for fiscal year 1976 and the transition period through September 30, 1976, for salaries and expenses of the Consumer Product Safety Commission and the Selective Service System; (2) for public lands development roads and trails by the Bureau of Land Management and road construction by the National Park Service available until June 30, 1976; and (3) for fiscal year 1976 and the transition period through September 30, 1976, for mutual educational and cultural exchange activities of the Department of State.