Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

National Science Foundation Authorization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill authorizing appropriations to the National Science Foundation for fiscal year 1977.


Actions Overview (11)

Date Actions Overview
10/11/1976Public law 94-471.
10/11/1976Signed by President.
10/01/1976Measure presented to President.
09/29/1976Conference report agreed to in House: House agreed to conference report.
09/27/1976Conference report filed: Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 94-1689.
09/24/1976Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report, roll call #647 (67-0).
05/27/1976Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended, in lieu of S. 3202.
05/14/1976Reported to Senate from the Committee on Labor and Public Welfare, S. Rept. 94-890.
03/25/1976Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, roll call #137 (358-33).
03/18/1976Reported to House from the Committee on Science and Technology, H. Rept. 94-930.
03/16/1976Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/11/1976Public law 94-471.
10/11/1976Signed by President.
10/01/1976HouseMeasure presented to President.
09/30/1976Measure enrolled in Senate.
09/30/1976Measure enrolled in House.
09/29/1976HouseHouse agreed to conference report.
09/27/1976HouseConference report filed in House, H. Rept. 94-1689.
09/24/1976SenateSenate agreed to conference report, roll call #647 (67-0).
06/24/1976HouseConference scheduled in House.
05/27/1976SenateConference scheduled in Senate.
05/27/1976SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended, in lieu of S. 3202.
05/27/1976SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
05/27/1976SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
05/14/1976SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Labor and Public Welfare, S. Rept. 94-890.
03/29/1976SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Labor and Public Welfare.
03/25/1976HouseMeasure passed House, amended, roll call #137 (358-33).
03/25/1976HouseMeasure considered in House.
03/24/1976HouseMeasure considered in House.
03/24/1976HouseMeasure called up by special rule in House.
03/18/1976HouseReported to House from the Committee on Science and Technology, H. Rept. 94-930.
03/16/1976HouseReferred to House Committee on Science and Technology.
03/16/1976HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (22)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science and Technology03/16/1976 Referred to
03/18/1976 Reported by H.Rept 94-930
Senate Labor and Public Welfare03/29/1976 Referred to
05/14/1976 Reported by S.Rept 94-890

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.12566. View summaries

Shown Here:
Conference report filed in House (09/27/1976)

(Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 94-1689)

National Science Foundation Authorization Act - Authorizes the appropriation of $810,700,000 to the National Science Foundation for fiscal year 1977.

Sets forth regulations with respect to the use of such funds.

Directs the National Science Foundation to: (1) support basic and applied research and education programs; (2) encourage and promote the conduct of interdisciplinary research through broadly based undergraduate interdisciplinary education programs; and (3) conduct an experimental "Science for Citizens Program" and an augmented "Public Understanding of Science Program.

Requires the Foundation to initiate a program of continuing education in science and technology including the development of special curricula, and the awarding of fellowships to scientists and engineers.

Directs the Foundation to intensify its search for qualified women, minorities, and handicapped individuals to fill executive level positions in the Foundation. Requires improving the representation of minorities, women, and handicapped individuals on advisory committees, review panels, and other mechanisms by which the scientific community provides assistance to the Foundation.

Directs the Foundation to establish an Office of Small Business Research and Development to foster communication between the Foundation and the small business community.

Amends the National Science Foundation Act to assure that the policies which the National Science Board establishes are within the framework of applicable national policies as set forth by the President and the Congress.

Requires the Director to keep the appropriate Congressional committees informed with respect to all activities of the Foundation.